ASD SPECIALTY HEALTHCARE LLC v. VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ASD SPECIALTY HEALTHCARE LLC doing business as BESSE MEDICAL
Defendant: VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY and CURT TYLER YOUNG
Case Number: 1:2023cv00201
Filed: May 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/24/2023. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 12/1/2023. Motions due by 12/15/2023. Ready for Trial on 2/6/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (slg)
July 7, 2023 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
July 7, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, by VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.(ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
July 7, 2023 Filing 16 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CURT TYLER YOUNG. (EILERS, MEREDITH)
July 7, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by CURT TYLER YOUNG.(EILERS, MEREDITH)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline is extended to July 7, 2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID M. COHEN. (COHEN, DAVID)
June 29, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CURT TYLER YOUNG Responses due by 7/20/2023. (ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
June 29, 2023 Reset Answer Deadline for VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY and CURT TYLER YOUNG per Order #14: Answer due by 7/7/2023. (slg)
June 5, 2023 Reset Answer Deadline for VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY and CURT TYLER YOUNG per Order #12: Answer due by 6/30/2023. (slg)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 06/30/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
June 2, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CURT TYLER YOUNG Responses due by 6/23/2023. (ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
May 26, 2023 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Acknowledgment of Service for VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY and CURT TYLER YOUNG : Answer due by 6/16/2023. (jwr)
May 26, 2023 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to All Defendants . (PRESCOTT, ADAM)
May 23, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ASD SPECIALTY HEALTHCARE LLC. VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY served on 5/23/2023. (PRESCOTT, ADAM)
May 23, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY per summons returned executed #9: Answer due by 6/13/2023. (slg)
May 19, 2023 Filing 8 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ASD SPECIALTY HEALTHCARE LLC. (PRESCOTT, ADAM)
May 12, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CURT TYLER YOUNG. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). Main Attachment: Summons - Vision Care of Maine LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons - Curt Tyler Young)(slg)
May 11, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ASD SPECIALTY HEALTHCARE LLC. (PRESCOTT, ADAM)
May 11, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED Summons Issued as to VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CURT TYLER YOUNG. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). Main Document: Vision Care of Maine, Limited Liability Company (Attachments: #1 Summons - Curt Tyler Young)(slg)
May 11, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ASD SPECIALTY HEALTHCARE LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 8/9/2023) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Credit Application, #2 Exhibit B - Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C - Financing Statement, #4 Exhibit D - Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Account Statement)(PRESCOTT, ADAM)
May 11, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CURT TYLER YOUNG. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). Main Document: Summons - Vision Care of Maine, Limited Liability Company (Attachments: #1 Summons - Curt Tyler Young)(slg)
May 11, 2023 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2798236.), filed by ASD SPECIALTY HEALTHCARE LLC.(PRESCOTT, ADAM)
May 10, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg)
May 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by ASD SPECIALTY HEALTHCARE LLC against VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CURT TYLER YOUNG PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 8/8/2023) Fee due by 5/12/2023. Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due by 5/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Credit Application, #2 Exhibit B Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C Financing Statement, #4 Exhibit D Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit E Account Statement)(slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASD SPECIALTY HEALTHCARE LLC v. VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASD SPECIALTY HEALTHCARE LLC doing business as BESSE MEDICAL
Represented By: ADAM R. PRESCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISION CARE OF MAINE, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL L. ROSENTHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURT TYLER YOUNG
Represented By: DANIEL L. ROSENTHAL
Represented By: MEREDITH C. EILERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?