GRAVEL v. SPENCE et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS R GRAVEL
Defendant: AARON SPENCE, ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC and ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00315
Filed: August 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Memorandum. Time is extended to October 12, 2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 27, 2023 Filing 20 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to file Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attachment and Attachment on Trustee Process to October 12, 2023 by THOMAS R GRAVEL Responses due by 10/18/2023. (NOONAN, KYLE)
September 27, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process per Order #21: Reply due by 10/12/2023. (slg)
September 22, 2023 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC. (ECONOMY, ALLISON)
September 22, 2023 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC. (ECONOMY, ALLISON)
September 22, 2023 Filing 17 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC. (ECONOMY, ALLISON)
September 22, 2023 Filing 16 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC. (ECONOMY, ALLISON)
September 22, 2023 Filing 15 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AARON SPENCE. (ECONOMY, ALLISON)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/9/2024. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/16/2024. Motions due by 3/1/2024. Ready for Trial on 5/7/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 22, 2023 Set Deadlines: Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due from ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC, ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC, AARON SPENCE by 9/29/2023. (slg)
September 21, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process filed by ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC, ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC, AARON SPENCE. Reply due by 10/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(ECONOMY, ALLISON) Modified on 9/21/2023 to clean up text (slg).
September 21, 2023 Filing 12 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against THOMAS R GRAVEL by ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC, AARON SPENCE, ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(ECONOMY, ALLISON) Modified on 9/21/2023 to clean up text (slg).
September 8, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process per Order #11: Responses due by 9/21/2023. (slg)
September 7, 2023 Reset Answer Deadline for AARON SPENCE ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC and ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC per Order #11: Answer due by 9/21/2023. (slg)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint; granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to File Motion for Attachment & Trustee Process. Time is extended to September 21, 2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 7, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process by AARON SPENCE ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC and ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC Responses due by 9/28/2023. (ECONOMY, ALLISON). Modified on 9/8/2023 to add all defendants to motion
September 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON A. ECONOMY on behalf of All Defendants (ECONOMY, ALLISON)
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R GRAVEL. AARON SPENCE served on 8/29/2023. (NOONAN, KYLE)
September 5, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for AARON SPENCE per summons returned executed #8: Answer due by 9/19/2023. (slg)
September 1, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R GRAVEL. ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC served on 8/31/2023. (NOONAN, KYLE)
September 1, 2023 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC : Answer due by 9/21/2023. (jwr)
August 28, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R GRAVEL. ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC served on 8/17/2023. (NOONAN, KYLE)
August 28, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC per summons returned executed #6: Answer due by 9/7/2023. (slg)
August 9, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC, ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC, AARON SPENCE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons to Advanced Development Company LLC, #2 Summons to Advanced Manufacturing Company LLC)(cjd)
August 9, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process by THOMAS R GRAVEL Responses due by 8/30/2023. (cjd)
August 9, 2023 Filing 3 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by THOMAS R GRAVEL. (cjd)
August 9, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
August 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC, ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC, AARON SPENCE with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by THOMAS R GRAVEL. (Service of Process Deadline 11/7/2023) Fee due by 8/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Equipment Contract, #2 Exhibit B Intellectual Property Contract, #3 Exhibit C A.Spence Email of 2/15/23, #4 Exhibit D Dept. of Labor Submission)(cjd)
August 9, 2023 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2838438.), filed by THOMAS R GRAVEL.(NOONAN, KYLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAVEL v. SPENCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS R GRAVEL
Represented By: KYLE M. NOONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON SPENCE
Represented By: ALLISON A. ECONOMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC
Represented By: ALLISON A. ECONOMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC
Represented By: ALLISON A. ECONOMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?