LOUTH CALLAN RENEWABLES LLC v. TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS
Plaintiff: LOUTH CALLAN RENEWABLES LLC
Defendant: TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS
Case Number: 1:2024cv00059
Filed: February 27, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS. (CROSMAN, KEVIN)
April 17, 2024 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dismiss Counts II and III and Punitive Damages) filed by LOUTH CALLAN RENEWABLES LLC. Reply due by 5/1/2024. (ADAMS, KIP)
April 9, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #24 Answer to Complaint: This filing was marked filed in error. Please see Reply to Counterclaim filed at Pleading #25 . (mlm)
April 9, 2024 Filing 25 Reply to Counterclaim #15 by LOUTH CALLAN RENEWABLES LLC. (ADAMS, KIP) Modified on 4/9/2024 to clean up text (mlm).
April 9, 2024 Filing 24 **FILED IN ERROR** ANSWER to COMPLAINT re ECF No. 12 by LOUTH CALLAN RENEWABLES LLC.(ADAMS, KIP) Modified on 4/9/2024 to mark filed in error, re-filed at Clerk's Office request (mlm).
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to Partial Motion to Dismiss. Time is extended to April 17, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 5, 2024 Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim per Order #23: Responses due by 4/17/2024. (slg)
April 4, 2024 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss to April 17, 2024 by LOUTH CALLAN RENEWABLES LLC Responses due by 4/25/2024. (ADAMS, KIP)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/30/2024. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 9/20/2024. Motions due by 10/4/2024. Ready for Trial on 11/4/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 28, 2024 Filing 20 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(CROSMAN, KEVIN)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting #17 Motion for Confidentiality Order. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 26, 2024 Filing 18 **FILED IN ERROR** Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS Responses due by 4/16/2024. (CROSMAN, KEVIN) Modified on 3/26/2024 to mark as filed in error (jam).
March 26, 2024 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS Responses due by 4/16/2024. (CROSMAN, KEVIN)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend Procedural Order. Deadline to file state court record is extended to March 29, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
March 19, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against LOUTH CALLAN RENEWABLES LLC by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS.(CROSMAN, KEVIN)
March 19, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Amended Notice of Removal by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS (CROSMAN, KEVIN)
March 19, 2024 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Amend Procedural Order by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS Responses due by 4/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CROSMAN, KEVIN)
March 19, 2024 Reset Deadlines per Order No. 16: State Court Record due by 3/29/2024. (jam)
March 15, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS Responses due by 4/5/2024. (CROSMAN, KEVIN)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Amend Procedural Order. Deadline to file state court record is extended to March 19, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
March 12, 2024 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Amend Procedural Order by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS Responses due by 4/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CROSMAN, KEVIN)
March 12, 2024 Reset Deadlines per Order No. 11: State Court Record due by 3/19/2024. (jam)
March 5, 2024 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LOUTH CALLAN RENEWABLES LLC. (ADAMS, KIP)
March 1, 2024 Reset Answer Deadline per Order No. 8: Answer due by 3/19/2024. (jad)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to March 19, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
March 1, 2024 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re Set/Reset Answer Deadline by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS Responses due by 3/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CROSMAN, KEVIN)
February 28, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard D. Holzheimer filed by KEVIN J. CROSMAN on behalf of TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2920098.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (CROSMAN, KEVIN)
February 28, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brooks H. Spears filed by KEVIN J. CROSMAN on behalf of TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2920096.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (CROSMAN, KEVIN)
February 28, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS. (CROSMAN, KEVIN)
February 28, 2024 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney BROOKS H. SPEARS,RICHARD DEAN HOLZHEIMER, JR must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 3/13/2024. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (jad)
February 27, 2024 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-2919778) filed by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS. (mlm)
February 27, 2024 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 3/12/2024. By DEPUTY CLERK: C. Derrah. (cjd)
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
February 27, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS. (Service of Process Deadline 5/28/2024) Fee due by 2/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(cjd)
February 27, 2024 Set Answer Deadline : Answer due by 3/5/2024. (cjd)
February 27, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings : Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Disclosure Statement due by 3/5/2024. (cjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOUTH CALLAN RENEWABLES LLC v. TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUTH CALLAN RENEWABLES LLC
Represented By: KIP J. ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TANGENT ENERGY SOLUTIONS
Represented By: KEVIN J. CROSMAN
Represented By: BROOKS H. SPEARS
Represented By: RICHARD D. HOLZHEIMER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?