WIDI v. MCNEIL et al
Plaintiff: DAVID J WIDI, JR
Defendant: PAUL MCNEIL, STEPHEN E HICKEY, JR, CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, DALE L ARMSTRONG, BRENT MCSWEYN, GLENN N ANDERSON, GRASSO, MORRIS, KIRK, KEVIN CURRAN, PAUL F SHAW, SCOTT C ROCHEFANT, SCOTT DURST, STEPHEN BORST, STEVE MAZZIOTTI, THEODORE STRONG, KEVIN CADY, ROBERT BROWN, ELLIOTT MOYA, ADAM C MARTIN, MATTHEW RAYMOND, JEROME CARR, MICHAEL COOK, JOHN DOES 1 - 5, DANTE PUOPOLO, ANDRE S WASSOUF, THOMAS PHELAN, DENNIS R CLARK, MICHAEL LYONS, OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY, TD BANKNORTH NA, TOWN OF ELIOT, DOUGLAS LARA, NEIL VACCARO and RYAN CORTINA
Case Number: 2:2012cv00188
Filed: June 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER granting 578 579 and 580 Motions for Sanctions By JUDGE JOSEPH A. DICLERICO, JR. (jwr)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER granting 428 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER dismissing without prejudice 462 Motion to Compel Discovery. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER ON MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DISCOVERY ORDER By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (ccs)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER deferring ruling on 462 Motion to Compel Discovery pending Local Rule 26(b) consultation and report By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jwr)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER denying 485 Motion to Correct the Record. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER dismissing as moot 426 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike ECF No. 403 and ECF No. 412. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 403 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 476 AMENDED RULE 54(b) CERTIFICATION ORDER ON COUNT XVIII By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (ccs)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER denying 379 Motion for Reconsideration. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 469 RULE 54(b) CERTIFICATION ORDER By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (ccs)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting 422 Motion for Summary Judgment on Count XVII of the Second Amended Complaint. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, granting 366 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 370 Motion for Reconsideration. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (ccs)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 457 Second Motion to Extend Time to file Opposition to Hickey and Grasso's Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER denying 400 Motion for Reconsideration of ECF No. 392; denying 400 Motion for Leave to File an Interlocutory Appeal. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting in part and deferring ruling in part 366 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment on Count XVIII By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER granting 407 Motion for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Grand Jury Matter. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER ON RECENTLY DISCOVERED DOCUMENTS By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (mlm)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 390 AMENDED ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and Enlargement of Time and Dismissing Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Service filed by DAVID J. WIDI, JR. This Amended Order corrects a typographical error on page 3 of the Order dated 11/29/2016 (ECF No. 389). Please see footnote 1 of this Amended Order for the correction. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE AND ENLARGEMENT OF TIME AND DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER OF SERVICE re: 381 Motion to Strike By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER denying 351 Motion for Recusal. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER denying 326 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment for Defendants Clark and Lyon. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER denying 292 Motion for Reconsideration filed by DAVID J WIDI, JR. This Motion 292 is denied with the exceptions outlined in the Order. Denying 311 Motion for Relief under Fed.R.Civ.P. 60 filed by DAVID J WIDI, JR. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER dismissing without prejudice 277 Motion to Dismiss Count XVIII of the Second Amended Complaint. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER denying 242 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Summary Judgment to Defendants Clark and Lyon; denying 246 Supplemental Motion for Reconsideration under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 59(e) and 60(b) with Accompanying Request for Discovery Order; denying 248 Second Supplemental Motion for Reconsideration under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 59(e) and 60(b). By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER dismissing as moot 197 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 198 Motion to Amend. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 214 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Clark and Lyon. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting 222 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to Responses to Motion for Reconsideration. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER dismissing without prejudice 224 Motion for Court Intervention; granting 225 Motion to Enlarge Time to File Response. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER denying 223 Motion for Clarification. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER dismissing without prejudice 220 Motion for Court Intervention Regarding Mail. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER dismissing without prejudice 196 Motion to Stay; denying 199 Motion to Strike; dismissing without prejudice 199 Renewed Motion for Vaughan Index. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER denying 174 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 180 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 180 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 AMENDED ORDER denying 44 Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment on Count XIV; dismissing without prejudice 59 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. This Amended Order corrects the date of the Order (ECF No. 172) filed on 9/27/2013. Please see Footnote 1 of the Amended Order. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER denying 44 Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment on Count XIV; dismissing without prejudice 59 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jgw)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 146 TD Bank's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot 161 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; denying 161 Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Discovery; and, dismissing without prejudice 162 Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Service. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 37 Defendant McNeil's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 134 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; denying 148 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 124 Motion to Disclose ; dismissing 140 Objection to Order on Motion to Disclose and Motion to Strike By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jgw)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying denying 121 Motion to Correct the Record; 114 Motion for Sanctions By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jgw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WIDI v. MCNEIL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID J WIDI, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN E HICKEY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALE L ARMSTRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENT MCSWEYN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN N ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN CURRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL F SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT C ROCHEFANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT DURST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN BORST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE MAZZIOTTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEODORE STRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN CADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIOTT MOYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM C MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW RAYMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEROME CARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1 - 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANTE PUOPOLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRE S WASSOUF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS PHELAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS R CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL LYONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD BANKNORTH NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF ELIOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS LARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL VACCARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN CORTINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?