HOWISON v. BANK OF AMERICA NA
Appellee: BANK OF AMERICA NA
Appellant: WILLIAM H HOWISON
Case Number: 2:2014cv00005
Filed: January 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF QUESTION OF STATE LAW TO THE MAINE SUPREMEJUDICIAL COURT SITTING AS THE LAW COURT By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (nwd)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECISION AND ORDER ON BANKRUPTCY APPEAL re 1 Bankruptcy Appeal; granting 4 Motion to Certify Questions of State Law to the Maine Supreme Judicial Court Sitting as the Law Court By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (nwd)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROCEDURAL ORDER- written positions on issues raised in the Procedural Order due by 3/21/2014. Replies, if any shall be filed by 3/28/2014. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (lrc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOWISON v. BANK OF AMERICA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BANK OF AMERICA NA
Represented By: JEFFREY J. HARDIMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WILLIAM H HOWISON
Represented By: JOSHUA R. DOW
Represented By: AARON P. BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?