OCONNOR et al v. OAKHURST DAIRY et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER OCONNOR, KEVIN OCONNOR and JAMES ADAM COX
Defendant: OAKHURST DAIRY and DAIRY FARMERS OF AMERICA INC
Case Number: 2:2014cv00192
Filed: May 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER ON FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES granting 214 Motion for Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Case Expenses; approving 215 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Service Awards By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mlm)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE-granting 94 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 112 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ON CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION granting 26 Motion to Certify Class By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (lrc)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM DECISION ON SCHEDULING re: denying 24 Motion for Order; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Order; granting 28 Motion to Extend Time By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mjlt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OCONNOR et al v. OAKHURST DAIRY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER OCONNOR
Represented By: CAROL GARVAN
Represented By: JEFFREY NEIL YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN OCONNOR
Represented By: CAROL GARVAN
Represented By: JEFFREY NEIL YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ADAM COX
Represented By: CAROL GARVAN
Represented By: JEFFREY NEIL YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAKHURST DAIRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIRY FARMERS OF AMERICA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?