VENEGAS v. GLOBAL AIRCRAFT SERVICE INC et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER VENEGAS
Defendant: GLOBAL AIRCRAFT SERVICE INC and LUFTHANSA TECHNIK NORTH AMERICA HOLDING CORP
Case Number: 2:2014cv00249
Filed: June 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Androscoggin
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 DECISION AND ORDER ON CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ATTORNEY FEES re: granting 176 Motion for Approval of Settlement; granting 177 Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB) Modified on 6/26/2017 to add the title of the order. (mjlt).
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER AUTHORIZING NOTICE OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT granting in part 164 Motion for Approval of Settlement and Authorizing Notice of Class Action Settlement. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB) Modified on 3/1/2017 to add full title of order (mnw).
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 100 Motion for Summary Judgment; 120 Motion for Leave to File By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (lrc)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 73 AND DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR COLLECTIVE ACTIONDECERTIFICATION 94 and 95 By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (rmb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VENEGAS v. GLOBAL AIRCRAFT SERVICE INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER VENEGAS
Represented By: ALLISON G. GRAY
Represented By: NICHOLAS W. WOODFIELD
Represented By: JEFFREY NEIL YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL AIRCRAFT SERVICE INC
Represented By: TIMOTHY J. O'BRIEN
Represented By: ROGER M. YALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUFTHANSA TECHNIK NORTH AMERICA HOLDING CORP
Represented By: TAWNY L. ALVAREZ
Represented By: ROBERT C. BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?