UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KIMBALL et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JOHN H KIMBALL, JR, KIMBALL FAMILY TRUST and BIRCH ROAD COUNTRY HOMES
Case Number: 2:2014cv00521
Filed: December 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Oxford
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE re: 74 Motion in Limine By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO AMEND denying 48 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part (as to Count 1) and denying in part (as to Count 2) 40 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jwr)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPORT OF PRE-FILING CONFERENCE UNDER LOCAL RULE 56(h) - Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/28/2016. Response due by 4/11/2016. Reply due by 4/25/2016. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KIMBALL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: W. DAMON DENNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN H KIMBALL, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBALL FAMILY TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIRCH ROAD COUNTRY HOMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?