MRS J et al v. PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Plaintiff: MRS J and MR J
Defendant: PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Case Number: 2:2015cv00084
Filed: March 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE; adopting 34 Report and Recommended Decision. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RECOMMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re 16 IDEA ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed under seal by PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS filed by PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS Objections to R&R due by 10/31/2016 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (ccs)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AFFIRMING RULING OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 24 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 17 Motion to Permit Presentation of Additional Evidence and Supplement the Record By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jgw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MRS J et al v. PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRS J
Represented By: STACEY D. NEUMANN
Represented By: KAITLYN MARIE WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MR J
Represented By: STACEY D. NEUMANN
Represented By: KAITLYN MARIE WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?