DOYLE v. TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DOYLE
Defendant: TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH and SCARBOROUGH TOWN COUNCIL MEMBERS
Case Number: 2:2015cv00227
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER affirming 59 the Recommended Decision of the Magistrate Judge for 59 Report and Recommended Decision, mooting 54 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MICHAEL DOYLE By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw) Modified on 2/7/2017 to indicate ECF 54 was mooted. (sfw).
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 54 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MICHAEL DOYLE. Objections to R&R due by 1/26/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part and dismissing without prejudice in part 28 Motion to Show Cause and Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER adopting 27 Report and Recommended Decision for 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH, SCARBOROUGH TOWN COUNCIL MEMBERS, 24 Renewed Motion to Dismiss filed by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH, SCARBOROUGH P OLICE DEPARTMENT, THOMAS HALL, SCARBOROUGH TOWN COUNCIL MEMBERS, and 26 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss filed by KATHERINE ST. CLAIR, TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH, SCARBOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, SHAWN BABINE, THOMAS HALL, WILLIAM DONOVAN, SCARBOROUGH TOWN COUNCIL MEMBERS, JEAN MARIE CATERINA, JESSICA HOLBROOK, PETER HAYES, EDWARD BLAISE; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 24 Renewed Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 26 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Affirming Report and Recommended Decision re 8 Report and Recommendations for 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; dismissing 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOYLE v. TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCARBOROUGH TOWN COUNCIL MEMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?