GLADU v. ROSS et al
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS A GLADU
Defendant: TROY ROSS, JOHN DOE and MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Case Number: 2:2015cv00274
Filed: July 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 142 Report and Recommendations for 131 Motion to Amend. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 131 MOTION to Amend filed by NICHOLAS A GLADU. Objections to R&R due by 4/4/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER AFFIRMING RULINGS OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re Order No. 109 and Order No. 125 By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER denying 104 Motion to Stay. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISON OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 94 Report and Recommendations for 38 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by TROY ROSS. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TROY ROSS. Objections to R&R due by 7/28/2016. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER AFFIRMING RULING OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 50 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 35 Motion to appoint expert witness. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 29 Report and Recommendations for 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by TROY ROSS. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S RULING DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL overruling 7 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLADU v. ROSS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS A GLADU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROY ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?