PORTLAND PILOTS INC, et al. v. NOVA STAR M/V, et al.
Defendant: NOVA STAR M/V and NOVA STAR CRUISES LTD
Intervenor_plaintiff: PORTLAND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, MAINE UNIFORM RENTAL INC and DNV GL AS
Claimant: PETER K LYONS, CENTURY RESORTS INTERNATIONAL LTD, SINGAPORE TECHNOLOGIES MARINE LTD, A L GRIFFIN INC, H R DISTRIBUTORS INC, SWELL MEDIA LLC and SALTWATER CREATIVE COMPANY LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00442
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER ON MOTION TO APPORTION CUSTODIAL COSTS denying 357 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 357 Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER ON MOTION TO APPORTION CUSTODIAL COSTS re 349 Motion Apportion of Custodial Costs By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER ON MOTION TO APPORTION CUSTODIAL COSTS - denying without prejudice 326 Motion to apportion custodial fees & expenses incurred by Owners between MUR and PDC. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 335 PROCEDURAL ORDER By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER denying 304 Bill of Costs; denying 309 Motion to Strike; granting 311 Motion for Leave to File By CLERK OF COURT, Christa K. Berry. (ckb)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER ON INTERVENOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL FINDINGS denying 295 Motion for additional findings. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS REGARDING TAXATION OF CUSTODIAL CHARGES TO CLAIMANT - denying 145 Cross Motion Regarding Taxation; granting 165 Motion To Tax or Otherwise Allocate Custodial Charges to Century Resorts. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 292 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW as to the claims of Maine Uniform Rental, Inc. (Pratt Abbott) - By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS re 221 Order to Show Cause - By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS of A.L. Griffin, Inc. and H.R. Distributors, Inc. re 204 Order to Show Cause. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS - granting 82 Motion for Prompt Hearing ; granting 104 Motion for Emergency Hearing. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PORTLAND PILOTS INC, et al. v. NOVA STAR M/V, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVA STAR M/V
Represented By: JOHN R. BASS, II
Represented By: EDWARD S. MACCOLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVA STAR CRUISES LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: PORTLAND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: U. CHARLES REMMEL, II
Represented By: TIMOTHY E. STEIGELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: MAINE UNIFORM RENTAL INC
Represented By: ROBERT W. KLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: DNV GL AS
Represented By: MICHAEL J. DALY
Represented By: MARGARET K. MINISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: PETER K LYONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: CENTURY RESORTS INTERNATIONAL LTD
Represented By: DAVID S. BISCHOFF
Represented By: LAURENCE W. DEMUTH, II
Represented By: EVELYN D. LEVINE
Represented By: LAURA A. REILLY
Represented By: CLIFFORD RUPRECHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: SINGAPORE TECHNOLOGIES MARINE LTD
Represented By: JOHN R. BASS, II
Represented By: EDWARD S. MACCOLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: A L GRIFFIN INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: H R DISTRIBUTORS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: SWELL MEDIA LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN M. FLAGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: SALTWATER CREATIVE COMPANY LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN M. FLAGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?