DAY v. GREY et al
Plaintiff: ROY A DAY
Defendant: LORNA R GREY, KENNETH GREY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY and 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2016cv00275
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY AND AFFIRMING DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT denying 22 Motion to Stay filed by ROY A DAY; denying 25 Motion to Vacate filed by ROY A DAY, adopting 23 Report and Recommended Decision dismissing 1 Complaint. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (ccs)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RECOMMENDED DISMISSAL re 1 Complaint, filed by ROY A DAY, 22 MOTION to Stay filed by ROY A DAY Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2017 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (sfw)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 10 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (ccs)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 Complaint filed by ROY A DAY Objections to R&R due by 12/8/2016 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (ccs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAY v. GREY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY A DAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORNA R GREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH GREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?