BURNETT v. OCEAN PROPERTIES LTD

Plaintiff: RYAN D BURNETT
Defendant: OCEAN PROPERTIES LTD
Case Number: 2:2016cv00359
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: York
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 164 ORDER ON MOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT REGULATIONS GOVERNING DOOR OPENING PRESSURE AND DOOR CLOSURE SPEED granting 162 Motion take Judicial Notice of the Americans with Disabilities Act Regulations Governing Door Opening Pressure and Door Closure Speed By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 156 ORDER ON MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ATTENDANCE ISSUES granting 112 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Attendance Issues By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order 138 ORDER ON MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING ALLEGED PHYSICAL INJURY denying 110 Motion in Limine Regarding Alleged Physical Injury By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order 134 ORDER ON MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DISMISSED CLAIMS dismissing without prejudice 107 Motion in Limine Regarding Dismissed Claims By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 81 ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 45 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA granting 42 Motion to Quash By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (ccs)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order 37 ORDER denying 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 19 Motion to Strike Impertinent Allegations. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 29 ORDER ON SEALING AND REDACTION By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURNETT v. OCEAN PROPERTIES LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN D BURNETT
Represented By: LAURA H. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN PROPERTIES LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?