DEPAOLO v. OCEAN PROPERTIES LTD et al
Plaintiff: CARY DEPAOLO
Defendant: OCEAN PROPERTIES LTD and GHM PORTLAND MAR LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00468
Filed: September 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - adopting 64 Report and Recommendations for 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GHM PORTLAND MAR LLC. Objections to R&R due by 8/24/2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S EXPERT, Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 10/20/2017, Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/25/2017, Motions due by 11/9/2017, Ready for Trial on 12/4/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS - denying 12 Motion to Dismiss. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEPAOLO v. OCEAN PROPERTIES LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARY DEPAOLO
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN PROPERTIES LTD
Represented By: TAWNY L. ALVAREZ
Represented By: NICHOLAS S. ANDREWS
Represented By: CATHERINE H. MOLLOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHM PORTLAND MAR LLC
Represented By: TAWNY L. ALVAREZ
Represented By: NICHOLAS S. ANDREWS
Represented By: CATHERINE H. MOLLOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?