ADAMS v. MONAHAN

Plaintiff: JON ROBERT ADAMS
Defendant: LUKE MONAHAN
Case Number: 2:2017cv00261
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2018 58 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 6 MOTION Declaratory Judgment filed by JON ROBERT ADAMS, 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JON ROBERT ADAMS, 52 MOTION Regarding Exhaustion Requirement filed by JON ROBERT ADAMS, 33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JON ROBERT ADAMS, 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JON ROBERT ADAMS, 11 Motion to Issue Order for access to Law Library filed by JON ROBERT ADAMS, 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JON ROBERT ADAMS, 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LUKE MONAHAN Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2018 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
October 24, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE 25 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
September 29, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION. Objections to R&R due by 10/13/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP) Modified on 9/29/2017 to remove link to motion to amend (mlm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADAMS v. MONAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON ROBERT ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUKE MONAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?