AVERILL v. FIANDACA
Plaintiff: CHERYL AVERILL
Defendant: JOSEPH J FIANDACA, JR
Case Number: 2:2017cv00287
Filed: July 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: York
Presiding Judge:
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ACCEPTING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: 21 Report and Recommendations ; 13 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; 13 Motion to Remand to State Court By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 22 Motion for Reconsideration. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 13 Second MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by CHERYL AVERILL. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AVERILL v. FIANDACA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH J FIANDACA, JR
Represented By: DONALD F. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL AVERILL
Represented By: GREGORY O. MCCULLOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?