REDMOND v. YACHTING SOLUTIONS LLC
Plaintiff: JOHN REDMOND
Defendant: YACHTING SOLUTIONS LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00292
Filed: August 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT denying 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 55 and 56 Motion to Strike Affidavits By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER FOLLOWING CONFERENCE- Stipulated Record due by 10/15/2018; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/22/2018, response due by 11/13/2018, reply due by 11/27/2018 By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REDMOND v. YACHTING SOLUTIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN REDMOND
Represented By: SAMUEL S. RIOTTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YACHTING SOLUTIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?