CHASE v. SAUFLEY et al

Plaintiff: DANIEL L CHASE
Defendant: LEIGH I SAUFLEY, DONALD G ALEXANDER, ANDREW M MEAD, ELLEN A GORMAN, JOSEPH M JABAR, JEFFREY L HJELM, THOMAS E HUMPHREY and STATE OF MAINE
Case Number: 2:2017cv00427
Filed: October 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISIONS OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE 50 58 By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ANDREW M MEAD, STATE OF MAINE, ELLEN A GORMAN, JOSEPH M JABAR, JEFFREY L HJELM, LEIGH I SAUFLEY, DONALD G ALEXANDER, THOMAS E HUMPHREY. Objections to R&R due by 2/23/2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 17 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus; 15 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and/or Restraining Order; 25 MOTION for Emergency Injunction; 19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHASE v. SAUFLEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL L CHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEIGH I SAUFLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD G ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M MEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLEN A GORMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH M JABAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY L HJELM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS E HUMPHREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?