CHASE v. MERSON et al
Plaintiff: JOHN F CHASE
Defendant: ARTHUR MERSON, ENDEAVOR PROJECT CONSULTANTS LLC, CHRISTOPHER M OCHOA, LAW OFFICE OF CHRIS OCHOA PA, RUSSELL HEARLD, STELLAR ENTERPRISES INC, MARK CLOUTIER, KEITH ROY, ROBERT CLOUTIER and DON PATCH
Case Number: 2:2018cv00165
Filed: April 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DECISION AND ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS - granting 83 , 104 & 105 Motions to decline supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims; denying 109 Motion to Amend Complaint ; denying 119 MOTION to Dismiss the Cloutier and Roy D efendants and Renewed Motion to Amend Complaint; No Action Necessary in light of the dismissal on 120 Motion to Stay, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 122 Motion for Attorney Fees. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PROCEDURAL ORDER. Status Report due by 7/19/2019. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (clp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 DECISION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANTS DON PATCH'S, KEITH ROY'S, ARTHUR MERSON'S, AND ENDEAVOR PROJECT CONSULTANTS LLC'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS - granting in part and reserving ruling in part on 83 Motion to Dismiss, 104 Motion to Dismiss and 105 Motion to Dismiss. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 PROCEDURAL ORDER re 83 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DON PATCH. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER ON CLOUTIER DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES denying 87 Motion for Attorney Fees By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DECISION AND ORDER ON CLOUTIER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS granting 61 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and 61 Motion for Costs, Motion for Attorney Fees, the application shall be made in accordance with Local Rule 54.2. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION ON MOTION FOR EX PARTE ATTACHMENT (unsealed on 1/25/19) 3 EX PARTE MOTION For Attachment By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mjlt)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS ARTHUR MERSON AND ENDEAVOR PROJECT CONSULTANTS, LLC - denying 50 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 60 Renewed Motion for Entry of Default ; denying 60 Motion for Default Judgment. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
November 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON SECOND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, AUTHORIZE SERVICE BY ALTERNATE MEANS - granting 43 Motion to Extend Time; granting 43 Motion to Authorize Service by Alternate Means. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS AND TO AUTHORIZE SERVICE BY PUBLICATION - granting 37 Motion to Extend Time; denying 37 Motion for Service by Publication. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
July 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER on 15 Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment and 12 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr) Modified on 7/16/2018 to correctly link to motions (jwr).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHASE v. MERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN F CHASE
Represented By: BENJAMIN S. PIPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR MERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDEAVOR PROJECT CONSULTANTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER M OCHOA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAW OFFICE OF CHRIS OCHOA PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL HEARLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STELLAR ENTERPRISES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK CLOUTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH ROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CLOUTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DON PATCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?