QUINCY et al v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Plaintiff: CINDI JUNE STACKHOUSE and GARY QUINCY
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00279
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/9/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/16/2019. Motions due by 1/30/2019. Ready for Trial on 4/1/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mtm)
August 22, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC.(EDGAR, DUNCAN)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. (EDGAR, DUNCAN)
July 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA KLEIN-GOLDEN on behalf of GARY QUINCY, CINDI JUNE STACKHOUSE (KLEIN-GOLDEN, JOSHUA)
July 23, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC Per Amended Order #7: Answer due by 8/23/2018. State Court Record due by 8/23/2018. (sfw)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER re 6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer and State Court Record filed by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. The defendant's Consent Motion to Extend Time is granted without objection. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint and file the state court record by August 23, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint by August 23, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer and State Court Record by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC Responses due by 8/9/2018. (EDGAR, DUNCAN)
July 18, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1871161.), filed by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC.(EDGAR, DUNCAN)
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. (EDGAR, DUNCAN)
July 17, 2018 Set Deadlines : Attorney Richard Golden shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 7/24/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (bfa)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 7/24/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
July 17, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC : Answer due by 7/24/2018. (bfa)
July 17, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/24/2018. (bfa)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maine District Court Bridgton, case number CV-2018-49. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 10/15/2018) Fee due by 7/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 summons, #3 notice of service of process, #4 notice of filing removal)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUINCY et al v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDI JUNE STACKHOUSE
Represented By: RICHARD GOLDEN
Represented By: JOSHUA KLEIN-GOLDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY QUINCY
Represented By: RICHARD GOLDEN
Represented By: JOSHUA KLEIN-GOLDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Represented By: DUNCAN A. EDGAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?