TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC v. KPJ ASSOCIATES LLC et al
Plaintiff: TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC
Defendant: PATRICK M MURPHY, JAMES O HASKELL, KPJ ASSOCIATES LLC and KATHIE L MURPHY
Case Number: 2:2018cv00293
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC. (PIPER, BENJAMIN)
September 17, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by JAMES O HASKELL, KPJ ASSOCIATES LLC, KATHIE L MURPHY, PATRICK M MURPHY. Reply due by 10/1/2018. (BREWSTER, SETH)
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC Responses due by 9/17/2018. (PIPER, BENJAMIN)
August 9, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for JAMES O HASKELL, KPJ ASSOCIATES LLC, KATHIE L MURPHY, PATRICK M MURPHY : Answer due by 10/2/2018. (akr)
August 9, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed JAMES O HASKELL waiver sent on 8/3/2018. (PIPER, BENJAMIN)
August 9, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed PATRICK M MURPHY waiver sent on 8/3/2018. (PIPER, BENJAMIN)
August 9, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed KATHIE L MURPHY waiver sent on 8/3/2018. (PIPER, BENJAMIN)
August 9, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed KPJ ASSOCIATES LLC waiver sent on 8/3/2018. (PIPER, BENJAMIN)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re #3 Motion for TRO By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
August 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties by KPJ ASSOCIATES LLC (BREWSTER, SETH)
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC. (PIPER, BENJAMIN)
August 1, 2018 Filing 8 Court Exhibit List from TRO Hearing held on August 1, 2018 (Exhibits listed on the Court Exhibit List are not remotely electronically available). (akr) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/1/2018 to include exhibit description) (akr).
August 1, 2018 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE JON D. LEVY: Hearing held re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC. (Court Reporter: Lori Dunbar) (akr)
August 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH W. BREWSTER on behalf of JAMES O HASKELL, KPJ ASSOCIATES LLC, KATHIE L MURPHY, PATRICK M MURPHY (BREWSTER, SETH)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Hearing set for 8/1/2018 02:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 1 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
August 1, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1878378.), filed by TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC.(PIPER, BENJAMIN)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to KPJ ASSOCIATES LLC, KATHIE L MURPHY, PATRICK M MURPHY and JAMES O HASKELL. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). First Attached Document: KPJ Associates LLC Summons (Attachments: #1 Kathie L. Murphy Summons, #2 Patrick M. Murphy Summons, #3 James O. Haskell Summons)(mnw)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cheryl Carrier, #2 Exhibit 1 to Carrier Declaration - Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 to Carrier Declaration - Letter dated July 27, 2018, #4 Declaration of Beth LaSalle, #5 Exhibit 1 to LaSalle Declaration - Letter dated March 23, 2018, #6 Exhibit 2 to LaSalle Declaration - Agenda for April 12, 2018 Franchising Meeting)(mnw)
July 31, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC by 8/3/2018. (mnw)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mnw)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KPJ ASSOCIATES LLC, KATHIE L MURPHY, PATRICK M MURPHY and JAMES O HASKELL filed by TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 10/29/2018) Fee due by 8/2/2018.(mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC v. KPJ ASSOCIATES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK M MURPHY
Represented By: SETH W. BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES O HASKELL
Represented By: SETH W. BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPJ ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By: SETH W. BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHIE L MURPHY
Represented By: SETH W. BREWSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC
Represented By: BENJAMIN S. PIPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?