IDEXX LABORATORIES INC v. LEACH et al
Plaintiff: IDEXX LABORATORIES INC
Defendant: DIRECT VET MARKETING INC, DAN LEACH and AGOSTINO SCICCHITANO
Case Number: 2:2018cv00296
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline : Answer due as to DAN LEACH, AGOSTINO SCICCHITANO and DIRECT VET MARKETING INC by 10/15/2018. (akr)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to October 15, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, to October 15 by DIRECT VET MARKETING INC, DAN LEACH, AGOSTINO SCICCHITANO Responses due by 10/19/2018. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
September 10, 2018 Set Deadlines : Attorney Siobhan Mee shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/18/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (lrc)
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. McManus filed by JEFF GOLDMAN on behalf of DIRECT VET MARKETING INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1897390.) (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Siobhan E. Mee filed by JEFF GOLDMAN on behalf of DIRECT VET MARKETING INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1897379.) (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DIRECT VET MARKETING INC. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by AGOSTINO SCICCHITANO (MCKEE, WALTER) Modified on 8/30/2018 to clarify docket text (lrc).
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER F. MCKEE on behalf of AGOSTINO SCICCHITANO (MCKEE, WALTER)
August 30, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for DAN LEACH, AGOSTINO SCICCHITANO and DIRECT VET MARKETING INC per Order No. 10 entered on 8/30/2018: Answers due by 10/1/2018. (lrc)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to October 1, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 29, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIRECT VET MARKETING INC due by 9/5/2018. (lrc)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by DIRECT VET MARKETING INC, DAN LEACH, AGOSTINO SCICCHITANO Responses due by 9/19/2018. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
August 16, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for DIRECT VET MARKETING INC per Summons Returned Executed filed on 8/16/2018: Answer due by 8/30/2018. (lrc)
August 16, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for DAN LEACH per Summons Returned Executed filed on 8/16/2018: Answer due by 8/29/2018. (lrc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IDEXX LABORATORIES INC. DIRECT VET MARKETING INC served on 8/9/2018. (FOUTS, ADRIANNE)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IDEXX LABORATORIES INC. DAN LEACH served on 8/8/2018. (FOUTS, ADRIANNE)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IDEXX LABORATORIES INC. (FOUTS, ADRIANNE)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin K. Beyer, Esq. filed by ADRIANNE E. FOUTS on behalf of IDEXX LABORATORIES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1881190.) (FOUTS, ADRIANNE)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael D. Wexler, Esq. filed by ADRIANNE E. FOUTS on behalf of IDEXX LABORATORIES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1881177.) (FOUTS, ADRIANNE)
August 6, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1880281.), filed by IDEXX LABORATORIES INC.(FOUTS, ADRIANNE)
August 6, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from IDEXX LABORATORIES INC by 8/13/2018. (mnw)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DAN LEACH, AGOSTINO SCICCHITANO and DIRECT VET MARKETING INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). First attached document: Leach Summons (Attachments: #1 Scicchitano Summons, #2 Direct Vet Marketing Inc Summons)(mnw)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 List of Party Information)(mnw)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAN LEACH, AGOSTINO SCICCHITANO and DIRECT VET MARKETING INC with Jury Demand filed by IDEXX LABORATORIES INC.PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 11/1/2018) Fee due by 8/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Scicchitano non-disclosure agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Scicchitano non-compete agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Leach non-disclosure agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Leach non-compete agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Leach cease and desist letter, #6 Leach cease and desist to VFC, #7 VFC acknowledgement of receipt of Idexx cease and desist letter, #8 April 4, 2018 cease and desist letter)(mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IDEXX LABORATORIES INC v. LEACH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IDEXX LABORATORIES INC
Represented By: MICHAEL D. WEXLER
Represented By: ADRIANNE E. FOUTS
Represented By: JUSTIN K. BEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECT VET MARKETING INC
Represented By: SIOBHAN E. MEE
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Represented By: DAVID A. MCMANUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN LEACH
Represented By: REBECCA S. WEBBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGOSTINO SCICCHITANO
Represented By: WALTER F. MCKEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?