SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. GREENLAW et al

Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: MNCS LLC, UPCS LLC, RICHARD J. GREENLAW, ILCS LLC, FLCS LLC, OHCS LLC, MICS LLC, PENNCS LLC, MASSCS LLC, MAINECS LLC, NECS LLC, NJCS LLC, IACS LLC, RICS LLC, NHCS LLC, NDCS LLC, NYCS LLC, VTCS LLC, CTCS LLC, WICS LLC, LOUCS LLC and RICHARD J GREENLAW
Case Number: 2:2018cv00321
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 30 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS granting #3 Motion for Judgment By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (slg)
October 12, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Interested Parties by MAINECS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties by WICS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Interested Parties by VTCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Interested Parties by UPCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Interested Parties by RICS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Interested Parties by PENNCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties by OHCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties by NYCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties by NJCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties by NHCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties by NECS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties by NDCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties by MNCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties by MICS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties by MASSCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties by LOUCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties by ILCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties by IACS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties by FLCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties by CTCS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re #3 Motion for Judgment, . Main Document: Updated Consent Forms. (DONAHUE, WILLIAM)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #7 Notice of Appearance to change filers from all defendants to all LLC defendants. (slg)
October 9, 2018 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/16/2018. (slg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN C. WHITING on behalf of NECS LLC, NYCS LLC , MAINECS LLC, VTCS LLC, MASSCS LLC, NHCS LLC, RICS LLC, CTCS LLC, FLCS LLC, ILCS LLC, IACS LLC, LOUCS LLC, MICS LLC, MNCS LLC, NDCS LLC, NJCS LLC, OHCS LLC, PENNCS LLC, UPCS LLC, and WICS LLC (WHITING, STEPHEN) Modified on 10/9/2018 to correct defendants represented by Stephen Whiting (slg).
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT B. BAKER on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (BAKER, ROBERT)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Telephone Conference held. (Court Reporter: Lori Dunbar) (mnw)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING re #3 Unopposed MOTION for Judgment and Entry of Order of Final Judgment as to All Defendants : Telephone Conference set for 9/7/2018 at 9:30 AM before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Judgment and Entry of Order of Final Judgment as to All Defendants by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION Responses due by 9/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Final Judgment as to All Defendants, #2 Consents of All Defendants to Entry of Final Judgment)(DONAHUE, WILLIAM)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CTCS LLC, FLCS LLC, RICHARD J. GREENLAW, IACS LLC, ILCS LLC, LOUCS LLC, MAINECS LLC, MASSCS LLC, MICS LLC, MNCS LLC, NDCS LLC, NECS LLC, NHCS LLC, NJCS LLC, NYCS LLC, OHCS LLC, PENNCS LLC, RICS LLC, UPCS LLC, VTCS LLC, WICS LLC with Jury Demand, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Service of Process Deadline 11/15/2018)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. GREENLAW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD J. GREENLAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASSCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINECS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NECS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NJCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IACS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VTCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WICS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUCS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. WHITING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD J GREENLAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: WILLIAM J. DONAHUE
Represented By: ROBERT B. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?