UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BECKWITH et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: BRIAN D BECKWITH, JULIA A HUNTER, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES and TOWN OF PORTER
Case Number: 2:2018cv00322
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Oxford
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 SET Deadlines: No Answer or Responsive Pleading filed by TOWN OF PORTER. Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 11/19/2018. (slg)
October 18, 2018 SET Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due on 10/26/2018. (slg)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER from Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties Handout. (slg)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BRIAN D BECKWITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slg)
October 9, 2018 Set Deadlines : No Answer or Responsive Pleading filed by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 11/8/2018. (mnw)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JULIA A HUNTER.(JOHNSON, LESLIE)
October 1, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for BRIAN D BECKWITH - Per Summons Returned Executed #7: Answer due by 10/17/2018. (mnw)
October 1, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for MAINE REVENUE SERVICES - Per Summons Returned Executed #6: Answer due by 10/5/2018. (mnw)
October 1, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF PORTER - Per Summons Returned Executed #5: Answer due by 10/17/2018. (mnw)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. BRIAN D BECKWITH served on 9/26/2018. (YU, JAMES)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. MAINE REVENUE SERVICES served on 9/14/2018. (YU, JAMES)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. TOWN OF PORTER served on 9/26/2018. (YU, JAMES)
September 14, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for JULIA A HUNTER - Per Summons Returned Executed #4: Answer due by 10/1/2018. (mnw)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. JULIA A HUNTER served on 9/10/2018. (YU, JAMES)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BRIAN D BECKWITH, JULIA A HUNTER, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, TOWN OF PORTER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons for Julia Hunter, #2 Summons for Maine Revenue Services, #3 Summons for Town of Porter)(jwr)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIAN D BECKWITH, JULIA A HUNTER, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, TOWN OF PORTER, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 11/15/2018)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BECKWITH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN D BECKWITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIA A HUNTER
Represented By: LESLIE H JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF PORTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JAMES YU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?