LONG et al v. FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Plaintiff: GARY LONG and SUSAN LONG
Defendant: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv00362
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
2 Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Case reassigned to JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL no longer assigned to the case. (mjlt)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/7/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/14/2019. Motions due by 3/28/2019. Ready for Trial on 6/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
October 17, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(HACKETT, AMY)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #11 State Court Record- This docket entry was modified to reflect that it was filed in error and has been correctly re-filed as ECF No. 12 (lrc)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Docket Record, #2 State Court Pleadings)(HACKETT, AMY)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 **FILED IN ERROR** STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(HACKETT, AMY) Modified on 9/25/2018 to reflect this filing was made in error and has been re-filed as ECF No. 12 (lrc).
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #9 State Court Record : This docket entry was modified to reflect that it was filed in error and will be re-filed by counsel. (lrc)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 **FILED IN ERROR** STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (HACKETT, AMY) Modified on 9/21/2018 to reflect this filing was made in error and will be re-filed by counsel (lrc).
September 21, 2018 Reset Deadlines per Order No. 8: State Court Record due by 9/25/2018. (lrc)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time. Counsel for the defendant shall file the duplicate record from the state court by September 25, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time to file State Court Record (until 9/25/18) by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION Responses due by 10/10/2018. (HACKETT, AMY)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (w/certificate of service) by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (HACKETT, AMY)
September 18, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION per Order No. 5: Answer due by 10/17/2018. (lrc)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting without objection #4 Motion to Extend Time. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint by October 17, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (until 10/17/18) (ASSENTED TO) by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION Responses due by 10/5/2018. (HACKETT, AMY)
September 12, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1898901.), filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(HACKETT, AMY)
September 11, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION : Answer due by 9/17/2018. (bfa)
September 11, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/18/2018. (bfa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 9/18/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CUMSC-RE-2018-212. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 12/10/2018) Fee due by 9/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 summary sheet, #2 complainr, #3 summons, #4 assessor property card)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LONG et al v. FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: AMY B. HACKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY LONG
Represented By: MARK A. KEARNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN LONG
Represented By: MARK A. KEARNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?