GALDO MELENDEZ v. PATRIAU
Plaintiff: MAYRA ALEJANDRA GALDO MELENDEZ
Defendant: GUSTAVO FAVERON PATRIAU
Case Number: 2:2018cv00377
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/5/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/12/2019. Motions due by 3/26/2019. Ready for Trial on 6/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURCOTTE on behalf of GUSTAVO FAVERON PATRIAU (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service - Amended Notice of Appearance)(TURCOTTE, JOHN)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURCOTTE on behalf of GUSTAVO FAVERON PATRIAU (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TURCOTTE, JOHN) Modified on 10/16/2018 to indicate this was filed in error and has been re-filed at ECF No.9 (sfw).
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GUSTAVO FAVERON PATRIAU. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BOWIE, JACOB)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JACOB F. BOWIE on behalf of GUSTAVO FAVERON PATRIAU (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BOWIE, JACOB)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to GUSTAVO FAVERON PATRIAU. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
September 18, 2018 Filing Fee Received from MAYRA ALEJANDRA GALDO MELENDEZ: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 218001621. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 9/18/2018 re #1 Complaint. (bfa)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (bfa)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by MAYRA ALEJANDRA GALDO MELENDEZ (bfa)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GUSTAVO FAVERON PATRIAU with Jury Demand, filed by MAYRA ALEJANDRA GALDO MELENDEZ. (Service of Process Deadline 12/17/2018)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GALDO MELENDEZ v. PATRIAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAYRA ALEJANDRA GALDO MELENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUSTAVO FAVERON PATRIAU
Represented By: JOHN A. TURCOTTE
Represented By: JACOB F. BOWIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?