RAYMOND et al v. MAINE SCHOOL ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICT 6 et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT RAYMOND and JENNY RAYMOND
Defendant: JENNIFER DONLAN, MAINE SCHOOL ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICT 6 and PAUL PENNA
Case Number: 2:2018cv00379
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JEANA M. MCCORMICK on behalf of All Defendants (MCCORMICK, JEANA)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA A. HEWEY on behalf of All Defendants (HEWEY, MELISSA)
September 26, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1905877.), filed by ROBERT RAYMOND, JENNY RAYMOND.(CLIFFORD, JAMES)
September 20, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for MAINE SCHOOL ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICT 6, PAUL PENNA, JENNIFER DONLAN : Answer due by 11/19/2018. (sfw)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed JENNIFER DONLAN waiver sent on 9/18/2018. (CLIFFORD, JAMES)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed PAUL PENNA waiver sent on 9/18/2018. (CLIFFORD, JAMES)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed MAINE SCHOOL ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICT 6 waiver sent on 9/18/2018. (CLIFFORD, JAMES)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JENNIFER DONLAN, MAINE SCHOOL ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICT 6, PAUL PENNA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Paul Penna summons, #2 Jennifer Donlan summons)(bfa)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JENNIFER DONLAN, MAINE SCHOOL ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICT 6, PAUL PENNA with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ROBERT RAYMOND, JENNY RAYMOND. (Service of Process Deadline 12/17/2018) Fee due by 9/20/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAYMOND et al v. MAINE SCHOOL ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICT 6 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER DONLAN
Represented By: JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE SCHOOL ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICT 6
Represented By: JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL PENNA
Represented By: JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT RAYMOND
Represented By: ANDREW P. COTTER
Represented By: PETER CLIFFORD
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNY RAYMOND
Represented By: ANDREW P. COTTER
Represented By: PETER CLIFFORD
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?