DRAKE v. TROTTIER

Plaintiff: JERRY DRAKE
Defendant: DAVID TROTTER and DAVID TROTTIER
Case Number: 2:2018cv00382
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
0 Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
1 Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/29/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 4/5/2019. Motions due by 4/19/2019. Ready for Trial on 7/8/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by DAVID TROTTIER.(STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against DAVID TROTTER, filed by JERRY DRAKE. (Service of Process Deadline 12/31/2018)(FISHER, WILLIAM)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint on or before October 8, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 29, 2018 Filing 5 First MOTION to Amend Complaint by JERRY DRAKE Responses due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(FISHER, WILLIAM)
September 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JERRY DRAKE (bfa)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID TROTTER PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JERRY DRAKE. (Service of Process Deadline 12/18/2018) Fee due by 9/21/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DRAKE v. TROTTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID TROTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID TROTTIER
Represented By: ELIZABETH G. STOUDER
Represented By: BETSY E. WAKEFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY DRAKE
Represented By: WILLIAM R. FISHER
Represented By: PATRICIA M ENDER
Represented By: PATRICIA M. ENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?