HULL v. ROCKWELL

Appellant: NETHANIEL RICHARD HULL and NATHANIEL RICHARD HULL
Appellee: JEFFREY J ROCKWELL
Case Number: 2:2018cv00385
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 BANKRUPTCY APPENDIX of Appellant by NATHANIEL RICHARD HULL. (HULL, NATHANIEL)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 Appellant(s) BRIEF by NATHANIEL RICHARD HULL as Ch. 7 Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estate of Jeffrey J. Rockwell. Brief by Appellee(s) due by 12/3/2018. (HULL, NATHANIEL)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties by NATHANIEL RICHARD HULL (HULL, NATHANIEL)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Appeal Procedural Order Appellant(s) Brief and Appendix due by 11/5/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Susan Way. (sfw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Certificate of Readiness received. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Chapter 7 Trustee's Statement of Issue on Appeal Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal and Statement Regarding Transcripts, #2 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election)(sfw)
October 3, 2018 Reset Deadlines : Attorney JENNIFER G HAYDEN shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 10/9/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (sfw)
September 21, 2018 Set Deadlines : Attorney JENNIFER G. HAYDEN shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/28/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (bfa)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY Appeal (the record on appeal is available at ecf.meb.uscourts.gov) received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court; Bankruptcy Court case number 15-20583-PGC., filed by NATHANIEL RICHARD HULL. (Check for Bankruptcy Appeal Certificate of Readiness 11/5/2018.) (Attachments: #1 BAP transmittal form, #2 BAP order for transfer, #3 BAP docket sheet, #4 BK order, #5 BK docket sheet)(bfa) Modified on 10/11/2018 to correct the spelling of the appellant's name(bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HULL v. ROCKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NETHANIEL RICHARD HULL
Represented By: NATHANIEL R. HULL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NATHANIEL RICHARD HULL
Represented By: NATHANIEL R. HULL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JEFFREY J ROCKWELL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEACH
Represented By: JAMES F. MOLLEUR
Represented By: TANYA SAMBATAKOS
Represented By: JENNIFER G. HAYDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?