KING et al v. WAL-MART STORES INC
Plaintiff: JAMES KING and MAUREEN KING
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES INC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00398
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/4/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/11/2019. Motions due by 3/25/2019. Ready for Trial on 6/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD WITH AFFIDAVIT of Daniel R. Mawhinney filed by WAL-MART STORES INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Docket Record, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Return of Service, #4 Exhibit D-Answer, #5 Exhibit E-Sup Court Removal)(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 10/11/2018 to clean up docket text (lrc).
October 5, 2018 Reset Deadlines per Order No. 6: State Court Record due by 10/12/2018. (lrc)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to Submit State Court Docket and Duplicate Record. Time is extended to October 12, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to Extend Time to Submit State Court Docket and Duplicate Record by WAL-MART STORES INC Responses due by 10/26/2018. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 10/5/2018 to clarify docket text (lrc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
September 28, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1907027.), filed by WAL-MART STORES INC.(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 10/5/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: J. Driscoll. (jgd)
September 28, 2018 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/5/2018 from WAL-MART STORES INC. (jgd)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jgd)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Summons Return, Complaint, and Answer from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number PORSC-CV-18-0395. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WAL-MART STORES INC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/27/2018) Fee due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return, #2 Complaint, #3 Answer)(jgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KING et al v. WAL-MART STORES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES KING
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. HARMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAUREEN KING
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. HARMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES INC
Represented By: DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?