KNIGHT v. PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al

Plaintiff: KELLY KNIGHT
Defendant: PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY EMPLOYEE BENEFITS ASSOCIATION TRUST and GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Case Number: 2:2018cv00407
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
0 Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
1 Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #10 : The docket entry has been modified to indicate it is a Request for Hearing Regarding a Discovery Dispute and the security restriction has been modified so that it is available to case participants only and is no longer publicly available in accordance with Local Rule 26(b). (sfw)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 (Access to document is restricted to case participants only)REQUEST FOR A HEARING REGARDING A DISCOVERY DISPUTE by KELLY KNIGHT Responses due by 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit Proposed Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit Proposed Third Party Subpoenas)(DAVIS, ANDREW) Modified on 11/30/2018 to indicate it is a Request for a Hearing Regarding a Discovery Dispute (sfw).
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY EMPLOYEE BENEFITS ASSOCIATION TRUST, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (slg)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER:Administrative Record due by 11/16/2018. Deadline for filing of Motion for Judgment on the Record for Judicial Review: 1/2/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick C. DiCarlo filed by GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1911129.) (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY EMPLOYEE BENEFITS ASSOCIATION TRUST, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
October 3, 2018 Set Deadlines: Attorney Patrick C. DiCarlo shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 10/10/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jib)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
October 3, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1908831.), filed by GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY, PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY EMPLOYEE BENEFITS ASSOCIATION TRUST.(SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
October 3, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY EMPLOYEE BENEFITS ASSOCIATION TRUST : Answer due by 10/9/2018. (bfa)
October 3, 2018 Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 10/10/2018. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (bfa)
October 3, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/10/2018. (bfa)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY EMPLOYEE BENEFITS ASSOCIATION TRUST, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 dockert record, #3 summary sheet, #4 Proof of Service on Graham Holdings Company, #5 Proof of Service Graham Holdings Company Long Term Disability Plan, #6 Proof of Service on Graham Holdings Company Employee Benefit Association Trust)(bfa)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-18-365. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY, PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY EMPLOYEE BENEFITS ASSOCIATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 12/31/2018) Fee due by 10/4/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KNIGHT v. PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ
Represented By: PATRICK C. DICARLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY
Represented By: GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ
Represented By: PATRICK C. DICARLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY EMPLOYEE BENEFITS ASSOCIATION TRUST
Represented By: GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ
Represented By: PATRICK C. DICARLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAHAM HOLDINGS COMPANY LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Represented By: GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ
Represented By: PATRICK C. DICARLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY KNIGHT
Represented By: ANDREW S. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?