US BANK TRUST NA v. THOITS et al
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA
Defendant: BETHANY A THOITS and RYAN W THOITS
Interested Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC, ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, CACH LLC and DISCOVER BANK
Case Number: 2:2018cv00417
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
2 Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Set Deadlines Regarding Order : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 12/14/2018. (jwr)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 20 Conference of Counsel. On November 29, 2018, I held a teleconference with Attorneys Longoria and Crosman, for the plaintiff and party-in-interest Maine Revenue Service, respectively, to inquire about pretrial discovery in this matter, where all defendants have been defaulted. Counsel stated that their clients did not intend to engage in discovery, and Attorney Longoria stated that she intended to file motions for default judgment imminently. Accordingly, without objection, I ORDERED the plaintiff to file its motions for default judgment by December 14, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
November 29, 2018 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III: Conference of Counsel held re: pretrial schedule; docket order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR) (RICH III, JOHN)
November 28, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 11/29/2018 01:00 PM with MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (nrg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 11/29/2018 01:00 AM with MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Counsel shall coordinate the call and contact chambers once both sides are on the line. (nrg)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 12/17/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: J. Driscoll. (jgd)
November 15, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Party-in-Interest Capital One Bank (USA), NA by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 12/6/2018. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
November 14, 2018 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 12/14/2018 as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA. (jgd)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC, CACH LLC, DISCOVER BANK, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC, BETHANY A THOITS, RYAN W THOITS. Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 12/13/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: J. Driscoll. (jgd)
November 12, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants, Bethany A. Thoits and Ryan W. Thoits; and Parties-in-Interest, Arrow Financial Services, LLC, CACH, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, and Discover Bank with Certificate of Service by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 12/3/2018. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
November 9, 2018 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 12/10/2018 as to RYAN W THOITS and BETHANY A THOITS. (jwr)
November 8, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA : Answer due by 11/13/2018. (jwr)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA served on 10/22/2018. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
November 7, 2018 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 12/7/2018 as to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC, CACH LLC and ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC. (jwr)
October 30, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for DISCOVER BANK: Answer due by 11/9/2018. (jib)
October 30, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for CACH LLC and PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC: Answer due by 11/6/2018. (jib)
October 30, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC: Answer due by 11/5/2018. (jib)
October 30, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for RYAN W THOITS and BETHANY A THOITS: Answer due by 11/7/2018. (jib)
October 30, 2018 Case Reassigned to JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY no longer assigned to the case. (mjlt)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK TRUST NA. DISCOVER BANK served on 10/19/2018. (DOONAN, JOHN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC served on 10/16/2018. (DOONAN, JOHN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. CACH LLC served on 10/16/2018. (DOONAN, JOHN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC served on 10/15/2018. (DOONAN, JOHN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. BETHANY A THOITS served on 10/17/2018. (DOONAN, JOHN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. RYAN W THOITS served on 10/17/2018. (DOONAN, JOHN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declartion in Support of Priority Position)(CROSMAN, KEVIN)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of US BANK TRUST NA (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT With Certificate of Service by US BANK TRUST NA. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
October 9, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1911358.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA.(DOONAN, JOHN)
October 9, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/16/2018. (bfa)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC, CACH LLC, CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA, DISCOVER BANK, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC, BETHANY A THOITS, RYAN W THOITS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Bethany A. Thoits summons, #2 Arrow Financial Services, LLC summons, #3 Cach LLC summons, #4 Discover Bank summons, #5 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC summons, #6 Maine Revenue Services summons, #7 Capital One Bank (USA) NA summons)(bfa)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BETHANY A THOITS, RYAN W THOITS PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA. (Service of Process Deadline 1/7/2019) Fee due by 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Lost Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E Assignment into Secretary of Housing & Urban Development, #6 Exhibit F Assignment into U.S. Bank Trust, #7 Exhibit G Quitclaim Assignment, #8 Exhibit H Demand Letters, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NA v. THOITS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETHANY A THOITS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN W THOITS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Represented By: KEVIN J. CROSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CACH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DISCOVER BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?