CONLEY-LEPENE v. DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH CONLEY-LEPENE
Defendant: DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00430
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
2 Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER re: #10 Motion for Confidentiality Order By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting without objection #9 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The court's scheduling order, ECF No. 6, is amended to enlarge the deposition limit to eight depositions per side. All other limitations and deadlines shall otherwise remain in effect. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by ELIZABETH CONLEY-LEPENE Responses due by 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Confidentiality Order)(HANSEN, CHAD)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by ELIZABETH CONLEY-LEPENE Responses due by 12/18/2018. (HANSEN, CHAD)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC. (SCOTT, K.)
November 16, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/21/2018 from DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC. (jgd)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL P. SCHWARZ on behalf of DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC (SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/28/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 4/4/2019. Motions due by 4/18/2019. Ready for Trial on 7/8/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)
November 8, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/15/2018 from DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC. (jwr)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC.(SCOTT, K.) Modified on 11/8/2018 to remove duplicative docket text (jwr).
October 30, 2018 Case Reassigned to JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. JUDGE JON D. LEVY no longer assigned to the case. (mjlt)
October 23, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC : Answer due by 11/8/2018. (akr)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ELIZABETH CONLEY-LEPENE. DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC served on 10/18/2018. (HANSEN, CHAD)
October 16, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1914977.), filed by ELIZABETH CONLEY-LEPENE.(HANSEN, CHAD)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ELIZABETH CONLEY-LEPENE. (Service of Process Deadline 1/14/2019) Fee due by 10/18/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONLEY-LEPENE v. DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH CONLEY-LEPENE
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DH YORK MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Represented By: DANIEL P. SCHWARZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?