AURITT v. AURITT et al

Plaintiff: GARY AURITT
Defendant: SHANNON AURITT, KATHLEEN HAMILTON and TAKE A SHOWER LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00471
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #18 Additional Attachments: Docket entry modified to correctly reflect a filed date of 1/9/2019 and to attach envelope. (jib)
January 9, 2019 Filing 20 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by KATHLEEN HAMILTON re #10 Motion to Dismiss. Main Document: Revision for dismissal for not following civil procedure (Redacted Attachments). (Attachments: #1 Copy of ECF #10, #2 Copy of ECF #10-2 Doctor's Note, #3 Copy of ECF #10-3 2018 Redacted Florida Limited Liability Company Annual Report, #4 Copy of ECF #7-4 Applicant's Reply Before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, #5 Copy of ECF 10-5 Portland District Court Order on Plaintiff's Motions for Contempt and to Enforce and Defendant's Motion for Contempt, #6 Copy of ECF #10-6 Portland District Court on Post-Hearing Motions to Reconsider, Reopen, Enforce, and for Contempt, #7 Copy of ECF #10-7 Motion for Judgment for Failure to Take Testimony Before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, #8 Copy of ECF #10-8 8 Applicant's Reply filed with Trademark and Appeal Board, #9 Copy of ECF #10-9 Applicant's Responses to First Set of Requests for Production filed with the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, #10 Copy of ECF #10-10 Applicant's Response to Opposer's First Set of Interrogatories filed before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, #11 Copy of ECF #10-11 Applicant's Responses to Opposer's First Set of Requests for Admission filed before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, #12 2nd Copy of ECF #10-10 Applicant's Response to Opposer's First Set of Interrogatories filed before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, #13 2nd Copy of ECF #10-11 Applicant's Responses to Opposer's First Set of Requests for Admission filed before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, #14 Envelope)(jib)
January 9, 2019 Filing 18 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by KATHLEEN HAMILTON re #7 Motion for a 30 day extension to hire counsel. Main Document: Revision for a 30 Day Extention to Hire Counsel (Redacted Attachments). (Attachments: #1 Copy of ECF #7, #2 Redacted copies of ECF #7-1, 7-2, 7-3, #3 Copy of ECF #7-4 Applicant's Reply, #4 Copy of ECF #7-5 Order on Post Hearing Motions, #5 Letter from Dr. Murray)(jib) (Additional attachment added on 1/11/2019: #6 Envelope) (jib). Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date filed (jib).
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines: Pro Se Appearance Form due from KATHLEEN HAMILTON by 1/22/2019. (jib)
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER to KATHLEEN HAMILTON from the Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (jib)
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due from Shannon Auritt by 1/22/2019. (mnw)
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER to Shannon Auritt from the Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (mnw)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SHANNON AURITT. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. Please also refer to the Information Handout for Pro Se Filers. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (mnw)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SHANNON AURITT. Responses due by 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Department of the Secretary of State Documents, #2 Portland District Court Order on Motions for Contempt and to Enforce Motion for Contempt, #3 Portland District Court Order on Post Judgment Motions, #4 Portland District Court Order on Additional Post Judgment Motions for Contempt and to Modify Child Support, #5 Portland District Court Order on Post-Hearing Motions to Reconsider, Reopen, Enforce and for Contempt, #6 Copies of Motion to Enforce filed with the Portland District Court, #7 Copies of Motion to Enforce filed with the Portland District Court, #8 Copies of Motion for Service by Alternative Means filed with the Portland District Court, #9 Portland District Court Order on Post Judgment Motions to Modify Divorce Judgment and to Enforce, #10 Divorce Judgment, #11 Envelope)(mnw)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by SHANNON AURITT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mnw)
January 3, 2019 Reset Answer Deadlines for KATHLEEN HAMILTON & TAKE A SHOWER LLC - Per Order #12: Answers due by 1/30/2019. (mnw)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for 30-day extension of time; striking #10 Motion to Dismiss. The defendant Kathleen Hamilton's motion for a 30-day extension to retain counsel for herself and her company, defendant Take A Shower LLC, is granted in the interest of judicial economy, even though Ms. Hamilton cannot represent Take A Shower LLC, which may only appear in this action if represented by an attorney. The later-filed motion for dismissal, ECF No. 10, filed on behalf of Ms. Hamilton and her LLC, is stricken because it is inconsistent with the motion for extension and void as to Take A Shower LLC, which is unrepresented by an attorney. The deadline for Ms. Hamilton and Take A Shower LLC to respond to the plaintiff's complaint is extended to January 30, 2019. I note that the deadline for the remaining defendant, Shannon Auritt, to respond to the plaintiff's complaint remains January 9, 2019, unless Ms. Auritt files her own motion for an extension. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TAKE A SHOWER LLC, KATHLEEN HAMILTON. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. Please also refer to the Information Handout for Pro Se Filers. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (slg)
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER #12 ENTERED ON 1/3/2019 BY U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III*** MOTION to Dismiss by KATHLEEN HAMILTON, TAKE A SHOWER LLC Responses due by 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Florida Driver's License and Vehicle Registration, #2 Doctor's Note, #3 2018 Florida Limited Liability Company Annual Report, #4 Applicant's Reply Before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, #5 Portland District Court Order on Plaintiff's Motions for Contempt and to Enforce and Defendant's Motion for Contempt, #6 Portland District Court on Post-Hearing Motions to Reconsider, Reopen, Enforce, and for Contempt, #7 Motion for Judgment for Failure to Take Testimony Before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, #8 Applicant's Reply filed with Trademark and Appeal Board, #9 Applicant's Responses to First Set of Requests for Production filed with the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, #10 Applicant's Response to Opposer's First Set of Interrogatories filed before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, #11 Applicant's Responses to Opposer's First Set of Requests for Admission filed before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, #12 Envelope)(slg) Modified on 1/3/2019 to add stricken notation, see Order #12 (mnw).
December 28, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for SHANNON AURITT : Answer due by 1/9/2019. (jwr)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GARY AURITT. SHANNON AURITT served on 12/19/2018. (HUNGERFORD, ANDRE)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE re ATTACHMENTS to #7 MOTION for a 30 day extension to hire counsel filed by TAKE A SHOWER LLC, KATHLEEN HAMILTON. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced documents contain personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. Please also refer to the Information Handout for Pro Se Filers. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (jib)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for a 30 day extension to hire counsel by KATHLEEN HAMILTON, TAKE A SHOWER LLC Responses due by 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Florida Vehicle Registration, #2 Florida LLC Annual Report, #3 Property Information, #4 Applicant's Reply, #5 Order on Post Hearing Motions)(jib)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to TAKE A SHOWER LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SHANNON AURITT, KATHLEEN HAMILTON. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Kathleen Hamilton summons)(bfa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SHANNON AURITT, KATHLEEN HAMILTON, TAKE A SHOWER LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Kathleen Hamilton summons, #2 Kathleen Hamilton summons, #3 Shannon Auritt summons, #4 Take A Shower LLC summons)(bfa)
November 15, 2018 Filing Fee Received from GARY AURITT: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 219000222. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 11/15/2018 re #1 Complaint. (bfa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (bfa)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHANNON AURITT, KATHLEEN HAMILTON, TAKE A SHOWER LLC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by GARY AURITT. (Service of Process Deadline 2/12/2019) Fee due by 11/16/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AURITT v. AURITT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY AURITT
Represented By: ANDRE JAMES HUNGERFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANNON AURITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN HAMILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKE A SHOWER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?