EVERETT v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC
Plaintiff: MAUREEN EVERETT
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00479
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAUREEN EVERETT. (LORANGER, GUY)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/7/2019. Motions due by 5/21/2019. Ready for Trial on 8/5/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC.(CATERINE, MELINDA)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Docket Record, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Complaint)(CATERINE, MELINDA)
November 27, 2018 Reset Deadlines : State Court Record due by 11/30/2018. (akr)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to File Certified State Court Record. Time is extended to November 30, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Certified State Court Record by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC Responses due by 12/17/2018. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
November 21, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC : Answer due by 12/7/2018. (akr)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Time is extended to December 7, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC Responses due by 12/11/2018. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
November 20, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1931774.), filed by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC.(CATERINE, MELINDA)
November 19, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC : Answer due by 11/26/2019. (bfa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 11/26/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
November 19, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/23/2018. (bfa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Superior Court, case number CV-18-202. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 2/19/2019) Fee due by 11/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 notice of removal, #3 service of process, #4 summary sheet, #5 summons)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVERETT v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAUREEN EVERETT
Represented By: GUY D. LORANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: MELINDA J. CATERINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?