SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. EMERSON
Plaintiff: SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: GUY RAYMOND EMERSON
Case Number: 2:2018cv00492
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Extend Time. The Hearing Re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction has been continued to 2/19/2019 at 10:00 AM. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Seal. Exhibit B shall be sealed until further order of the Court. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
January 4, 2019 Reset Deadlines (previous deadline was set in error) : Pro Se Appearance Form due on 1/18/2019. (lrc)
January 4, 2019 Set Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due on 1/14/2019. (lrc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 27 Letter from the Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties Handout (lrc)
January 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Continued Hearing Re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION - Continued Hearing set for 2/19/2019 10:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 1 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (lrc)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Continue Hearing. The Temporary Restraining Order entered on December 4, 2018, and modified on December 18, 2018 shall remain in effect pending the entry of an order on the Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (lrc)
December 28, 2018 Filing 24 Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (WHITAKER, JOHN) Modified on 12/31/2018 to change the event type to Motion to Continue (lrc).
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/17/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/24/2019. Motions due by 6/7/2019. Ready for Trial on 8/5/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (lrc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 22 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by GUY RAYMOND EMERSON re #21 Motion to Extend Time to Hire Attorney. Main document- Letter to the Court Re: Disclaimer (Attachments: #1 Disclaimer)(lrc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Extend Time to Hire an Attorney by GUY RAYMOND EMERSON (lrc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint, by GUY RAYMOND EMERSON. (Attachments: #1 Article titled Tricks of the Trade)(lrc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of John Whitaker re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #18 Supplemental Memorandum filed by SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Emerson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of website takedown)(WHITAKER, JOHN)
December 27, 2018 Filing 18 Supplemental Memorandum of Law by SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY in support of #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (WHITAKER, JOHN) Modified on 12/28/2018 to clarify docket text (lrc).
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Continued Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Hearing set for 1/2/2019 02:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 1 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE JON D. LEVY: Motion Hearing held and continued re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (akr) Modified on 12/19/2018 to remove reference to TRO portion of ECF #4 (akr).
December 14, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for GUY RAYMOND EMERSON : Answer due by 12/28/2018. (akr)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. GUY RAYMOND EMERSON served on 12/7/2018. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to First Amended Complaint - current version of offending website by SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(SANCHEZ, GERALDINE) Modified on 12/12/2018 to remove duplicative text (akr).
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against GUY RAYMOND EMERSON, filed by SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 3/11/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B to First Amended Complaint cover sheet, #2 Exhibit C to First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit D to First Amended Complaint)(SANCHEZ, GERALDINE) Modified on 12/12/2018 to remove duplicative text(akr).
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Whitaker filed by GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ on behalf of SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1942110.) (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Hearing set for 12/18/2018 03:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 3 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (lrc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to GUY RAYMOND EMERSON. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
December 5, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1939207.), filed by SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for TRO By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (bfa)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (bfa)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to complaint by SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - offending website capture)(bfa)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GUY RAYMOND EMERSON with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 3/4/2019) Fee due by 12/6/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. EMERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ
Represented By: JOHN WHITAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUY RAYMOND EMERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?