LANDRY v. ADVANCED HOME ACTIVITIES INC et al
Plaintiff: LYNN LAVORGNA LANDRY
Defendant: SEPHORA STORE AT THE MAINE MALL, SEPHORA USA INC and ADVANCED HOME ACTIVITIES INC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00509
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended by SEPHORA USA INC. (WHITMAN, JOHN)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by LYNN LAVORGNA LANDRY (RIDGE, MARTIN)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by SEPHORA USA INC.(WHITMAN, JOHN)
January 3, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for SEPHORA USA INC - Per ECF No. 6-6, State Court Order on Motion to Extend Time : Answer deadline reset to 1/10/2019. (mnw)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by SEPHORA USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Record, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Motion for Extension, #4 Order granting extension, #5 Unopposed motion for enlargement of time, #6 Supplement Order granting enlargement of time)(WHITMAN, JOHN)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SEPHORA USA INC. (WHITMAN, JOHN)
December 27, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1948713.), filed by SEPHORA STORE AT THE MAINE MALL, SEPHORA USA INC.(WHITMAN, JOHN)
December 27, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for SEPHORA USA INC : Answer due by 1/3/2019. (bfa)
December 27, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2019. (bfa)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 1/3/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Michelle K. Seacord filed by SEPHORA USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Name Search)(bfa)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-18-301. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SEPHORA USA INC. (Service of Process Deadline 3/27/2019) Fee due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 complaint)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANDRY v. ADVANCED HOME ACTIVITIES INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNN LAVORGNA LANDRY
Represented By: MARTIN RIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPHORA STORE AT THE MAINE MALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPHORA USA INC
Represented By: JOHN S. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED HOME ACTIVITIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?