MILLER et al v. 3M COMPANY
Plaintiff: ROBERT MILLER and JANICE MILLER
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv00510
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Reset Deadlines Per Order #17: Counsel's report regarding mediation due by 3/15/2019. (sfw)
February 22, 2019 Set Deadlines Per Order #17: Counsel's report regarding mediation due by 2/15/2019. (sfw)
February 22, 2019 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines - Per Order #17: Discovery due by 7/11/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/18/2019. Motions due by 8/1/2019. Ready for Trial on 9/9/2019. (sfw)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part #14 Objection to Scheduling Order. On February 22, 2019, I held a telephonic hearing on the parties' joint objection to the court's scheduling order with Attorneys MacAdam, Eckerly, Tabasky, and Sullivan to discuss the parties' request for an approximately three-month extension of the pretrial deadlines to accommodate mediation following preliminary discovery. After discussion, I extended the existing pretrial deadlines by approximately one month, but ORDERED that initial disclosures be served by March 5, 2019 (the date the parties had proposed), that written discovery requests be served by March 15, 2019, and that counsel report in writing to the court the mediator's name and mediation date also by March 15, 2019. The remaining pretrial deadlines are extended as follows: the plaintiff's expert designation to May 9, 2019; the defendant's expert designation to June 14, 2019; the discovery deadline to July 11, 2019; the plaintiff's written settlement demand and the defendant's written response to June 27 and July 11, 2019, respectively; the Local Rule 56(h) notice deadline to July 18, 2019; and, the dispositive/Daubert/Kumho motions deadline to August 1, 2019. The case shall remain trial-ready on September 9, 2019, to allow for the possibility that no L.R. 56(h) notice is given by the new July 18 deadline. Finally, after March 15, 2019, the clerk's office is directed to schedule a further telephonic scheduling conference following the parties' initiation of discovery and agreement on a mediation date. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III: Hearing held on 2/22/2019 re: ECF No. 14; docket order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR) (RICH III, JOHN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #14 Joint OBJECTION to #13 Scheduling Order, and Proposed Discovery Plan : Telephone Conference set for 2/22/2019 10:00 AM with MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Counsel shall coordinate the call and contact chambers once both sides are on the line. (nrg)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 Joint OBJECTION to #13 Scheduling Order, and Proposed Discovery Plan filed by JANICE MILLER, ROBERT MILLER. Responses due by 3/5/2019. (MACADAM, JAMES)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/11/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 6/18/2019. Motions due by 7/2/2019. Ready for Trial on 9/9/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (sfw)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by JANICE MILLER, ROBERT MILLER re #9 State Court Record,, . Main Document: Summons and Executed Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint. (MACADAM, JAMES)
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney JASON P ECKERLY and PATRICK F SULLIVAN III shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 1/14/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (sfw)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick F. Sullivan, III filed by JONATHAN F. TABASKY on behalf of 3M COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1952851.) (TABASKY, JONATHAN)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason P. Eckerly filed by JONATHAN F. TABASKY on behalf of 3M COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1952850.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Certification For Hac Vice on behalf of Jason P. Eckerly)(TABASKY, JONATHAN)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by 3M COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to State Court Docket Record, #2 Affidavit in Compliance with Procedural Order, #3 Plaintiffs' Complaint, #4 Defendant 3M Company's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Defendant 3M Company's Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit A to Defendant 3M Company's Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit B to Defendant 3M Company's Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit C to Defendant 3M Company's Notice of Removal)(TABASKY, JONATHAN) Modified on 1/7/2019 to remove duplicative text (sfw).
January 4, 2019 Reset Deadlines Per Order #8: State Court Record due by 1/14/2019. (sfw)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time. Counsel for the removing party shall file with the clerk of this court a complete copy of the State Court duplicate record by January 14, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by 3M COMPANY. (TABASKY, JONATHAN)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant 3M Company's ANSWER to Complaint by 3M COMPANY.(TABASKY, JONATHAN)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time 10 days to Comply Procedural Order by 3M COMPANY Responses due by 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(TABASKY, JONATHAN) Modified on 1/4/2019 to remove duplicative text (sfw).
January 2, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1950512.), filed by 3M COMPANY.(TABASKY, JONATHAN)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 CORRECTED NOTICE of Removal correcting #1 Notice of Removal by 3M COMPANY. (jwr)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 1/4/2019. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
December 28, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for 3M COMPANY : Answer due by 1/4/2019 per F.R.Civ.P 81(c). (jwr)
December 28, 2018 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/4/2019 from 3M COMPANY. (jwr)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by 3M COMPANY with State Court Pleadings Complaint and Summons from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number PORSC-CV-2018-529. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 3/28/2019) Fee due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State court complaint and summons, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Demand dated 4/9/2018, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Counteroffer dated 9/28/2018, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER et al v. 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MILLER
Represented By: JAMES J. MACADAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE MILLER
Represented By: JAMES J. MACADAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: JONATHAN F. TABASKY
Represented By: PATRICK F. SULLIVAN, III
Represented By: JASON P. ECKERLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?