AMBROSE v. ENERGY NORTH INC

Plaintiff: LUCILLE AMBROSE
Defendant: ENERGY NORTH INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00006
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Each side may take up to six depositions. The remaining terms of the Scheduling Order shall remain in full force and effect. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by LUCILLE AMBROSE Responses due by 3/13/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin M. Sibbernsen filed by KEVIN M. SIBBERNSEN on behalf of ENERGY NORTH INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1978154.) (SIBBERNSEN, KEVIN)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/20/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 6/27/2019. Motions due by 7/11/2019. Ready for Trial on 9/9/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties by ENERGY NORTH INC. (SCOTT, K.)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by ENERGY NORTH INC.(SCOTT, K.)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by K. JOSHUA SCOTT on behalf of ENERGY NORTH INC (SCOTT, K.)
January 15, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint, for ENERGY NORTH INC : Answer due by 1/31/2019. (sfw)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LUCILLE AMBROSE. ENERGY NORTH INC served on 1/10/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
January 5, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1952853.), filed by LUCILLE AMBROSE.(HANSEN, CHAD)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ENERGY NORTH INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ENERGY NORTH INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LUCILLE AMBROSE. (Service of Process Deadline 4/4/2019) Fee due by 1/7/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMBROSE v. ENERGY NORTH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENERGY NORTH INC
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Represented By: KEVIN M. SIBBERNSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCILLE AMBROSE
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?