LINCOLN COUNTY v. PURDUE PHARMA LP et al
Plaintiff: LINCOLN COUNTY
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, PURDUE PHARMA LP, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, CVS PHARMACY INC, DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO, ALLERGAN PLC, CEPHALON INC, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, WALMART INC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC, PURDUE PHARMA INC, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, ACTAVIS LLC, MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD and WALGREEN CO
Case Number: 2:2019cv00021
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
2 Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY for all further proceedings By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mjlt)
March 28, 2019 Filing 54 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Electronic Civil Case Transfer. Case electronically transferred to Northern District of Ohio has been opened on 03/28/2019 as case 1:19-op-45190. (mlm)
March 26, 2019 Filing 53 Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (mnw)
March 26, 2019 Filing 52 MDL CERTIFIED ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE MARCH 28, 2019, HEARING SESSION ORDER (mnw)
March 26, 2019 Filing 51 MDL ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDERAND VACATING THE MARCH 28, 2019, HEARING SESSION ORDER (mnw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. CAMPBELL on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
February 15, 2019 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
February 15, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles C. Lifland filed by MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1976659.) (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
February 15, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
February 11, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC & JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC by 2/19/2019. (mnw)
February 11, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from CHARLES C. LIFLAND by 2/19/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (mnw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Cheffo filed by RITCHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1972472.) (BERGER, RITCHIE)
February 7, 2019 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP. (BERGER, RITCHIE)
February 7, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by RITCHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (BERGER, RITCHIE)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting without objection #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Time is extended for all Defendants to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
January 31, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC & JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC by 2/8/2019. (mnw)
January 31, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from MARK CHEFFO & CHARLES C. LIFLAND by 2/8/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (mnw)
January 30, 2019 Filing 41 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO Responses due by 2/20/2019. (STURTEVANT, MAUREEN)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting without objection #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Time is extended to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
January 29, 2019 Filing 39 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION Responses due by 2/19/2019. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA)
January 23, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from MARK CHEFFO and CHARLES C. LIFLAND, by 1/30/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (slg)
January 23, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, by 1/30/2019. (slg)
January 23, 2019 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
January 23, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Welch, P.C. filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1963317.) (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
January 18, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC. (HAWKINS, CHRISTOPHER)
January 18, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LINCOLN COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Summons served on Actavis LLC, #2 Summons served on Actavis Pharma, #3 Summons served on Allergan Finance, #4 Summons served on Cephalon, #5 Summons served on CVS, #6 Summons served on Endo Health, #7 Summons served on Endo Pharm, #8 Summons served on Insys, #9 Summons served on Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #10 Summons served on Johnson & Johnson, #11 Summons served on Mallinckrodt, #12 Summons served on Purdue Frederick, #13 Summons served on Purdue Pharma Inc., #14 Summons served on Purdue Pharma LP, #15 Summons served on Rite Aid Corporation, #16 Summons served on Rite Aid of Maine, #17 Summons served on Teva, #18 Summons served on Walgreens, #19 Summons served on Walmart, #20 Summons served on Watson Lab)(BELLEAU, JAMES)
January 18, 2019 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service by LINCOLN COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service-Janssen Pharmaceutica, #2 Affidavit of Service-Ortho-McNeil-Janssen, #3 Affidavit of Service-Rite Aid of Maryland)(BELLEAU, JAMES)
January 18, 2019 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to AmerisourceBergen, Cardinal, Dr. Cieniawski, Dr. Bruehl, Dr. Jorgensen and McKesson. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service for AmerisourceBergen, #2 Acceptance of Service for Cardinal, #3 Acceptance of Service for Drs. Bruehl and Cieniawski, #4 Acceptance of Service for Dr. Jorgensen, #5 Acceptance of Service for McKesson)(BELLEAU, JAMES)
January 18, 2019 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC. (PERRY, KATHARINE)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting without objection #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Time is extended to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
January 18, 2019 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALMART INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
January 18, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Lovrien filed by DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY on behalf of WALMART INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961438.) (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add name of PHV attorney (slg).
January 18, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Madeleine K. Rodriguez filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961394.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA)
January 18, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Geiger filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961377.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA)
January 18, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of K. Neil Austin filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961370.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA)
January 17, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by CVS PHARMACY INC, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WALMART INC Responses due by 2/7/2019. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
January 17, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC. (CAHOON, JOSEPH)
January 17, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by MAUREEN M. STURTEVANT on behalf of DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO (STURTEVANT, MAUREEN)
January 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
January 16, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brien T. O'Connor and Andrew J. O'Connor filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-1960013.) (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice - AJ O'Connor)(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
January 16, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC. (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
January 16, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC. (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD)
January 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI on behalf of RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD)
January 16, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
January 16, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Zane Watts filed by KAREN FRINK WOLF on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1959751.) (WOLF, KAREN)
January 15, 2019 Filing 43 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION re #13 State Court Record. Main Document: Docket Record for Lincoln County Superior Court Case No. WISSC-CV-2018-00043. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Demand Letter to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Actavis LLC, #4 Exhibit 3 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Actavis Pharma Inc, #5 Exhibit 4 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Allergan PLC, #6 Exhibit 5 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Bruehl, #7 Exhibit 6 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Cardinal Health 110 LLC, #8 Demand Letter to Cephalon Inc, #9 Exhibit 8 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Cieniawski, #10 Exhibit 9 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #11 Exhibit 10 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #12 Exhibit 11 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Insys Therapeutics Inc, #13 Exhibit 12 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #14 Exhibit 13 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #15 Exhibit 14 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Johnson & Johnson, #16 Exhibit 15 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Jorgensen, #17 Exhibit 16 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, #18 Exhibit 17 to Complaint - Demand Letter to McKesson Corp, #19 Exhibit 18 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #20 Exhibit 19 to Complaint - Demand Letter to The Purdue Frederick Co, #21 Exhibit 20 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma Inc, #22 Exhibit 21 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma LP, #23 Exhibit 22 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #24 Exhibit 23 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Watson Laboratories Inc, #25 McKesson Corp's Assented to Motion to Extend Deadline, #26 Notice of Entry of Appearance Hanlon, #27 AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, #28 Entry of Appearance Petruccelli, #29 Order Granting McKesson Corp's Assented to Motion, #30 Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion to Extend Time, #31 Entry of Appearance Hawkins, #32 Order Granting AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion, #33 Order Granting Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion, #34 Moving Defendants' Assented to Motion to Extend Deadline, #35 Entry of Appearance Cahoon, #36 Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Assented to Motion to Extend Deadlines, #37 Bruehl and Cieniawski's Consented to Motion to Extend Deadline, #38 Order Granting Bruehl and Cieniawski's Consented to Motion, #39 Order Granting Moving Defendants' Assented to Motion, #40 Order Granting Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Assented to Motion)(mnw)
January 15, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline per Order #15: Answer due by 3/4/2019 from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, CEPHALON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC, MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WALMART INC, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD, and MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD. (slg)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Time is extended to March 4, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS & MARK G. LAVOIE on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) Modified on 1/16/2019 to reflect that the appearance is also on behalf of Mark G. Lavoie (mnw).
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LINCOLN COUNTY. (BELLEAU, JAMES)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (WOLF, KAREN)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM R. LEE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LEE, ADAM)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (HANLON, MELISSA)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS PHARMACY INC. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Conor B. O'Croinin filed by GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ on behalf of CVS PHARMACY INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1958248.) (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
January 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1957045.), filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION.(DUNLAP, JOSHUA)
January 11, 2019 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 1/18/2019 from Mark Cheffo, Charles Lifland, Donna Welch and Conor O'Croinin. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jwr)
January 11, 2019 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, CEPHALON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC, MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CVS PHARMACY INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WALMART INC, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, RITE AID OF MAINE INC due by 1/18/2019. (jwr) Modified on 1/11/2019 to add parties who need to file corporate disclosure statements (slg).
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER to MDL Panel. (jwr)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 1/18/2019. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Extend Time for all defendants to File Answer until March 4, 2019 filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. No pdf document attached. See ECF #1. (slg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (jwr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings State court complaint from Lincoln County Superior Court, case number CV-18-43. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 4/10/2019) Fee due by 1/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Dunlap, #2 Ex. A to Declaration Complaint, #3 Ex. 1 to Complaint Demand letter to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #4 Ex. 2 to Complaint Demand letter to Actavis LLC, #5 Ex. 3 to Complaint Demand letter to Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a/ Watson Pharma, Inc., #6 Ex. 4 to Complaint Demand letter to Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc, #7 Ex. 5 to Complaint Demand letter to Dr. Bruehl, #8 Ex. 6 to Complaint Demand letter to Cardinal Health 110, LLC, #9 Ex. 7 to Complaint Demand letter to Cephalon, Inc., #10 Ex. 8 to Complaint Demand letter to Dr. Cieniawski, #11 Ex. 9 to Complaint Demand letter to Endo Health Solutions Inc., #12 Ex. 10 to Complaint Demand letter to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., #13 Ex. 11 to Complaint Demand letter to Insys Therapeutics, Inc., #14 Ex. 12 to Complaint Demand letter to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #15 Ex. 13 to Complaint Demand letter to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #16 Ex. 14 to Complaint Demand letter to Johnson & Johnson, #17 Ex. 15 to Complaint Demand letter to Dr. Jorgensen, #18 Ex. 16 to Complaint Demand letter to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, #19 Ex. 17 to Complaint Demand letter to Mckesson Corporation, #20 Ex. 18 to Complaint Demand letter to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #21 Ex. 19 to Complaint Demand letter to The Purdue Frederick Company, #22 Ex. 20 to Complaint Demand letter to Purdue Pharma Inc., #23 Ex. 21 to Complaint Demand letter to Purdue Pharma L.P., #24 Ex. 22 to Complaint Demand letter to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #25 Ex. 23 to Complaint Demand letter to Watson Laboratories, Inc.)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINCOLN COUNTY v. PURDUE PHARMA LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: MELISSA M. HANLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA LP
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Represented By: RITCHIE E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID CORPORATION
Represented By: GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC
Represented By: GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY INC
Represented By: CONOR B. O'CROININ
Represented By: GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO
Represented By: MAUREEN M. STURTEVANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF MAINE INC
Represented By: GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Represented By: RYAN ZANE WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC
Represented By: DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER LOVRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Represented By: RITCHIE E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC
Represented By: DONNA WELCH
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC
Represented By: KATHARINE S. PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA INC
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Represented By: RITCHIE E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD
Represented By: MARK G. LAVOIE
Represented By: MADELEINE K. RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: DAVID R. GEIGER
Represented By: K. NEIL AUSTIN
Represented By: JOSHUA D. HADIARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER D. HAWKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Represented By: RYAN ZANE WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSHUA D. DUNLAP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK
Represented By: ANDREW J. O'CONNOR
Represented By: BRIEN T. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC
Represented By: JOSEPH L. CAHOON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD
Represented By: MARK G. LAVOIE
Represented By: MADELEINE K. RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: DAVID R. GEIGER
Represented By: K. NEIL AUSTIN
Represented By: JOSHUA D. HADIARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN CO
Represented By: JOSEPH L. CAHOON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINCOLN COUNTY
Represented By: JAMES E. BELLEAU
Represented By: ADAM R. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?