BALDWIN v. MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED
Plaintiff: THOMAS BALDWIN
Defendant: MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED
Case Number: 2:2019cv00026
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED. (MCDONOUGH, MATTHEW)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by THOMAS BALDWIN. Reply due by 3/7/2019. (WEYRENS, DAVID)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED Responses due by 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff Goldman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(MCDONOUGH, MATTHEW)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by THOMAS BALDWIN. (DONAHUE, BENJAMIN)
January 23, 2019 set Deadlines : Attorney Jonathan Stern shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 1/25/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mjlt)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Stern filed by BENJAMIN N. DONAHUE on behalf of THOMAS BALDWIN (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1963127.) (DONAHUE, BENJAMIN)
January 18, 2019 Set Deadlines: Attorney MATTHEW C. MCDONOUGH shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 1/24/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jib)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew McDonough filed by JEFF GOLDMAN on behalf of MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961037.) (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of S. Elaine McChesney filed by JEFF GOLDMAN on behalf of MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961036.) (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 - 2 - Complaint, #3 - 3 - Summary Sheet, #4 - 4 - Mtn. to Admit PHV, #5 - 5 - Order Admitting PHV, #6 - 6 - Summons, #7 - 7 - Mtn. to Enlarge Time, #8 - 8 - Order on Mtn. to Enlarge Time)(GOLDMAN, JEFF)
January 14, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1957865.), filed by MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED.(GOLDMAN, JEFF)
January 11, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED : Answer due by 1/31/2019. (bfa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 1/18/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED. (bfa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-2018-544. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED. (Service of Process Deadline 4/11/2019) Fee due by 1/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 declaration of JEFF GOLDMAN, #2 Exhibit A Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Summons, #4 Exhibit C Assented-to Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint, #5 Exhibit D Goldman Decllaration at 44-80, #6 Exhibit E Goldman Decllaration at 5-11, #7 Exhibit F Goldman Decllaration at 2)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BALDWIN v. MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW C. MCDONOUGH
Represented By: S. ELAINE MCCHESNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS BALDWIN
Represented By: BENJAMIN N. DONAHUE
Represented By: DAVID A. WEYRENS
Represented By: JONATHAN STERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?