TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA v. TOTEM STEEL INTERNATIONAL INC

Plaintiff: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Defendant: TOTEM STEEL INTERNATIONAL INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00027
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA (SEGAL, STEPHEN)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (DUNITZ, JONATHAN)
January 14, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1957824.), filed by TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA.(DUNITZ, JONATHAN)
January 11, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/18/2019. (bfa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TOTEM STEEL INTERNATIONAL INC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 4/11/2019) Fee due by 1/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Policy)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA v. TOTEM STEEL INTERNATIONAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOTEM STEEL INTERNATIONAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: STEPHEN B. SEGAL
Represented By: JONATHAN M. DUNITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?