KENDRICK v. MAINE MEDICAL CENTER et al
Plaintiff: SUSAN KENDRICK
Defendant: MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, MAINE HEALTH and MAINEHEALTH
Case Number: 2:2019cv00028
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/17/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/24/2019. Motions due by 8/7/2019. Ready for Trial on 10/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, MAINEHEALTH.(SCHNEIDER, RONALD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MAINE HEALTH, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER. (SCHNEIDER, RONALD) Modified on 2/15/2019 to reflect that this is an Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement (lrc).
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MAINE HEALTH, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER. (SCHNEIDER, RONALD)
January 24, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for MAINE MEDICAL CENTER and MAINE HEALTH per Order No. 8 entered on 1/24/2019: Answers due by 2/26/2019. (lrc)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting without objection #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendants shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by February 26, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 24, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement from defendants due by 2/7/2019. (lrc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by MAINE HEALTH, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER Responses due by 2/14/2019. (SCHNEIDER, RONALD)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD W. SCHNEIDER, JR on behalf of MAINE HEALTH, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER (SCHNEIDER, RONALD)
January 18, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for MAINE MEDICAL CENTER - Per Summons Returned Executed #5: Answer due by 2/5/2019. (mnw)
January 18, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for MAINE HEALTH - Per Summons Returned Executed #4: Answer due by 2/5/2019. (mnw)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUSAN KENDRICK. MAINE MEDICAL CENTER served on 1/15/2019. (TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUSAN KENDRICK. MAINE HEALTH served on 1/15/2019. (TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
January 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1957631.), filed by SUSAN KENDRICK.(TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MAINE MEDICAL CENTER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to MaineHealth)(mjlt)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mjlt)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAINE HEALTH, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SUSAN KENDRICK. (Service of Process Deadline 4/11/2019) Fee due by 1/14/2019.(mjlt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENDRICK v. MAINE MEDICAL CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: RONALD W. SCHNEIDER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINEHEALTH
Represented By: RONALD W. SCHNEIDER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN KENDRICK
Represented By: ALLAN K. TOWNSEND
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?