OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC et al v. CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC et al
Plaintiff: RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC and SAMUEL EAKIN
Defendant: PAUL MAPELLI, DAVID STEVENS, JACK BOSCH, STEVEN JONES, MARK NOYES, DAVID EDSON, CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC, PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA, JAMES PAGE, WARD STROSSER, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM, CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC, JAMES W SEWALL COMPANY, CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC, TREADWELL FRANKLIN INFRASTRUCTURE CAPITAL LLC and CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00029
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Count XIV, #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #48 MOTION to Dismiss : Responses due by 4/15/2019. (akr)
February 28, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA Responses due by 3/21/2019. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
February 28, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Count XIV by JAMES PAGE, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM Responses due by 3/21/2019. (STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
February 28, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss by JACK BOSCH, CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC, PAUL MAPELLI, MARK NOYES, PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA, WARD STROSSER Responses due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
February 28, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #45 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JAMES PAGE, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM. Reply due by 3/14/2019. (STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
February 28, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JACK BOSCH, CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC, PAUL MAPELLI, MARK NOYES, PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA, WARD STROSSER. Reply due by 3/14/2019. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
February 10, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Remand to State Court by SAMUEL EAKIN, OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC Responses due by 3/4/2019. (GINN, CLIFFORD)
February 4, 2019 Set Deadlines : Motions to Dismiss due by 2/28/2019. (akr)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting without objection #42 Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule. The defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss (not to exceed 50 pages) and the Page Defendants' and the Bank's separate motions (not to exceed 20 pages apiece) shall be filed by February 28, 2019; the plaintiffs' oppositions to the consolidated motion, the Page Defendant's motion, and the Bank's motion (not to exceed 50 pages, 20 pages, and 20 pages, respectively) shall be filed by April 15, 2019; and the defendants' consolidated reply, the Page Defendants' reply, and the Bank's reply (not to exceed 18 pages, 7 pages, and 7 pages, respectively) shall be filed by May 6, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 24, 2019 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III: Hearing held on 1/24/2019 re: ECF No. 42; docket order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR) (RICH III, JOHN)
January 24, 2019 Filing 42 JOINT Proposed Discovery and Motion Filing Plan & Briefing Schedule by JACK BOSCH, CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC, DAVID EDSON, JAMES W SEWALL COMPANY, STEVEN JONES, PAUL MAPELLI, MARK NOYES, JAMES PAGE, PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA, DAVID STEVENS, WARD STROSSER, TREADWELL FRANKLIN INFRASTRUCTURE CAPITAL LLC, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND) Modified on 2/4/2019 to add motion part at the request of Judge Rich (slg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
January 23, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Attorney JAMES J. STRICKER shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 1/30/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw)
January 23, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA by 1/30/2019. (mnw)
January 23, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID S. BISCHOFF on behalf of JAMES PAGE (BISCHOFF, DAVID)
January 18, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #20 Summons Returned Executed, #19 Summons Returned Executed, #32 Summons Returned Executed, #26 Summons Returned Executed, #28 Summons Returned Executed, #24 Summons Returned Executed, #27 Summons Returned Executed, #25 Summons Returned Executed, #22 Summons Returned Executed, #29 Summons Returned Executed, #33 Summons Returned Executed, #23 Summons Returned Executed, #30 Summons Returned Executed, #21 Summons Returned Executed, #18 Summons Returned Executed, #31 Summons Returned Executed: Docket entries modified to add party served and date of service. (jib)
January 18, 2019 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC. (GINN, CLIFFORD)
January 18, 2019 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC. (GINN, CLIFFORD)
January 18, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH F. QUINBY on behalf of JACK BOSCH, CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC, PAUL MAPELLI, MARK NOYES, WARD STROSSER (QUINBY, ELIZABETH)
January 18, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference re ECF No. 13 and 17 set for 1/24/2019 11:00 AM with MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Counsel shall coordinate the call and contact chambers once all participants are on the line. (nrg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding Set Deadlines as to Clarissa A. Gomez and Jason Kislin to file Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 1/22/2019. This docket entry was modified by the Clerk's Office to reflect the deadline was set in error by the Clerk's Office. The Pro Hac Certificates were filed on on 1/17/19. (mjlt)
January 18, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Clarissa A. Gomez and Jason Kislin shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 1/22/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mjlt)
January 17, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. WARD STROSSER served on 12/27/2019 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add WARD STROSSER served on 12/27/2019 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. JACK BOSCH served on 12/29/2018 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add JACK BOSCH served on 12/29/2018 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. PAUL MAPELLI served on 12/26/2018 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add PAUL MAPELLI served on 12/26/2018 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. MARK NOYES served on 1/2/2019 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add MARK NOYES served on 1/2/2019 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC served on 12/26/2018 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to ad CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC served on 12/26/2018 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC served on 12/26/2018 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC served on 12/26/2018 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. JAMES PAGE served on 12/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Return Page - Official Capacity)(GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add JAMES PAGE served on 12/21/2018 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM served on 12/21/2018 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM served on 12/21/2018 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. DAVID STEVENS served on 12/26/2018 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add DAVID STEVENS served on 12/26/2018 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. TREADWELL FRANKLIN INFRASTRUCTURE CAPITAL LLC served on 1/7/2019. (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add TREADWELL FRANKLIN INFRASTRUCTURE CAPITAL LLC served on 1/7/2019 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. JAMES W SEWALL COMPANY served on 12/26/2018. (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add JAMES W SEWALL COMPANY served on 12/26/2018 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. DAVID STEVENS served on 12/26/2018 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add DAVID STEVENS served on 12/26/2018 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. DAVID EDSON served on 12/26/2019 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add DAVID EDSON served on 12/26/2019 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC served on 1/2/2019 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC served on 1/2/2019 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC served on 1/2/2019 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC served on 1/2/2019 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA served on 1/2/2019 (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA served on 1/2/2019 (jib).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting without objection #13 Motion to Stay; granting without objection #13 Motion for Conference of Counsel. The defendants' deadlines to respond to the plaintiffs' complaint are stayed. The clerk of court is requested to schedule a telephonic scheduling conference within the next 10 days to establish a briefing schedule for the defendants' anticipated motions to dismiss. The parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule (or separate schedules if they are unable to agree) prior to the teleconference. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 17, 2019 ***DEADLINE SET IN ERROR BY THE CLERK'S OFFICE***Set Deadlines as to Clarissa A. Gomez and Jason Kislin : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 1/22/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (mjlt) Modified on 1/18/2019 to reflect the deadline was set in error(mjlt).
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clarissa A. Gomez filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of JACK BOSCH, CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC, PAUL MAPELLI, MARK NOYES, WARD STROSSER (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1960462.) (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Kislin, Esq. filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of JACK BOSCH, CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC, PAUL MAPELLI, MARK NOYES, WARD STROSSER (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1960444.) (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #13 Consent MOTION to Stay Deadlines to Answer or Otherwise Respond MOTION for Conference of Counsel: Docket entry modified to add CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC and CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC as filing parties, and to add MOTION for Conference of Counsel. (jib)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Stay Deadlines to Answer or Otherwise Respond MOTION for Conference of Counsel by JACK BOSCH, CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC, DAVID EDSON, JAMES W SEWALL COMPANY, STEVEN JONES, PAUL MAPELLI, MARK NOYES, JAMES PAGE, PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA, DAVID STEVENS, WARD STROSSER, TREADWELL FRANKLIN INFRASTRUCTURE CAPITAL LLC, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM, CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC Responses due by 2/6/2019. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND) Modified on 1/16/2019 to add CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC as filing parties and to add MOTION for Conference of Counsel (jib).
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with Certificate of Service by TREADWELL FRANKLIN INFRASTRUCTURE CAPITAL LLC. (CRESWELL, RANDY)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #8 Summons Returned Executed : This entry has been marked "Filed in Error". The Clerk's Office requests that counsel refile the summonses as individual PDF documents and refile the acknowledgments as individual PDF documents and under the correct CM/ECF Event. (akr)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JAMES W SEWALL COMPANY. (TAYLOR, ADAM)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by H. ILSE TEETERS-TRUMPY on behalf of DAVID EDSON, JAMES W SEWALL COMPANY, DAVID STEVENS (TEETERS-TRUMPY, H.)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC, RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC, SAMUEL EAKIN. All Defendants. (GINN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 1/15/2019 (akr).
January 15, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney James J. Stricker shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 1/22/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (akr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James J. Stricker filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1958556.) (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
January 14, 2019 Set Answer Deadlines for CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC, CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC, WARD STROSSER, JACK BOSCH, MARK NOYES, PAUL MAPELLI, JAMES W SEWALL COMPANY, DAVID EDSON, DAVID STEVENS, PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA, JAMES PAGE and TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM : Per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81(c)(2), case removed on 1/11/2019 and no acknowledgement of service on file - Answers due by 1/18/2019. (mnw)
January 14, 2019 Set Answer Deadlines for TREADWELL FRANKLIN INFRASTRUCTURE CAPITAL LLC & STEVEN JONES: Per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81(c)(2)- Acknowledgement of Service dated January 7, 2019 (ECF No. 1-19), Answers due by 1/28/2019. (mnw)
January 14, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1957756.), filed by DAVID STEVENS, JAMES PAGE, DAVID EDSON, PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA, CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC, PAUL MAPELLI, CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC, JACK BOSCH, WARD STROSSER, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM, MARK NOYES, CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC, JAMES W SEWALL COMPANY, TREADWELL FRANKLIN INFRASTRUCTURE CAPITAL LLC, STEVEN JONES.(SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
January 11, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/18/2019. (mnw)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mnw)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number PORSC-CV-2018-00465 filed by DAVID STEVENS, JAMES PAGE, DAVID EDSON, PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA, CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC, PAUL MAPELLI, CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC, CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC, JACK BOSCH, WARD STROSSER, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM, MARK NOYES, CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC, JAMES W SEWALL COMPANY, TREADWELL FRANKLIN INFRASTRUCTURE CAPITAL LLC, STEVEN JONES.. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 4/11/2019) Fee due by 1/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 3.Affidavit of Sigmund D. Schutz Regarding Superior Court Documents, #2 Cumberland County Superior Court Docket Sheet, #3 5.Superior Court Summary Sheet, #4 6.Superior Court Complaint, #5 7.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit A Old Town Utility LLC Operating Agreement, #6 8.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit B Teaming Agreement, #7 9.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit C Sewall Mortgage to Merrill Merchants Bank, #8 10.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit D Sewall Supplemental Mortgage, #9 11.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit E Agreement to Provide Services and Compensation Schedule, #10 12.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit F Offer Letter, #11 13.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit G Revised Offer Letter, #12 14.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit H CVG Teaming Agreement, #13 15.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit I MCP Teaming Agreement, #14 16.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit J MFGR Letter Agreement for City to Purchase Facility, #15 17.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit K Draft Buy-Sell Instrument, #16 18.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit L Audit Committee, #17 19.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit M ConEd Solutions Withdrawal Letter, #18 20.Superior Court Complaint, Exhibit N Peoples United Discharge of Sewall Mortgage and Supplemental Mortgage, #19 21.Defendant Jones and Treadwell Acknowledgment of Service)(mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC et al v. CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL MAPELLI
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Represented By: CLARISSA A. GOMEZ
Represented By: JASON H. KISLIN
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. QUINBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID STEVENS
Represented By: ADAM S. TAYLOR
Represented By: H. ILSE TEETERS-TRUMPY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK BOSCH
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Represented By: CLARISSA A. GOMEZ
Represented By: JASON H. KISLIN
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. QUINBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN JONES
Represented By: RANDY J. CRESWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK NOYES
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Represented By: CLARISSA A. GOMEZ
Represented By: JASON H. KISLIN
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. QUINBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID EDSON
Represented By: ADAM S. TAYLOR
Represented By: H. ILSE TEETERS-TRUMPY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED EDISON ENERGY INC
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Represented By: CLARISSA A. GOMEZ
Represented By: JASON H. KISLIN
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. QUINBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEOPLES UNITED BANK NA
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Represented By: JAMES J. STRICKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES PAGE
Represented By: CLIFFORD RUPRECHT
Represented By: DAVID S. BISCHOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARD STROSSER
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Represented By: CLARISSA A. GOMEZ
Represented By: JASON H. KISLIN
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. QUINBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT INC
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Represented By: CLARISSA A. GOMEZ
Represented By: JASON H. KISLIN
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. QUINBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES W SEWALL COMPANY
Represented By: ADAM S. TAYLOR
Represented By: H. ILSE TEETERS-TRUMPY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CON EDISON CLEAN ENERGY BUSINESS INC
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Represented By: CLARISSA A. GOMEZ
Represented By: JASON H. KISLIN
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. QUINBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TREADWELL FRANKLIN INFRASTRUCTURE CAPITAL LLC
Represented By: RANDY J. CRESWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Represented By: CLARISSA A. GOMEZ
Represented By: JASON H. KISLIN
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. QUINBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RELENTLESS CAPITAL COMPANY LLC
Represented By: CLIFFORD M. GINN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC
Represented By: CLIFFORD M. GINN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL EAKIN
Represented By: CLIFFORD M. GINN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?