KARAMANOGLU v. TOWN OF YARMOUTH et al

Plaintiff: SELCUK KARAMANOGLU
Defendant: TOWN OF YARMOUTH, MICHAEL MORRILL and BRIAN ANDREASEN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00031
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/26/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 8/2/2019. Motions due by 8/16/2019. Ready for Trial on 10/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mtm)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by BRIAN ANDREASEN, MICHAEL MORRILL, TOWN OF YARMOUTH.(BENJAMIN, EDWARD)
January 24, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF YARMOUTH, MICHAEL MORRILL, and BRIAN ANDREASEN -per Waivers of Service Returned Executed filed on 1/24/2019: Answers due by 3/18/2019. (lrc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed All Defendants . Waivers sent on 1/15/2019 (SMITH, TYLER) Modified on 1/24/2019 to insert the date that the waivers were sent (lrc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BRIAN ANDREASEN, MICHAEL MORRILL, TOWN OF YARMOUTH. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Michael Morrill summons, #2 Town of Yarmouth summons)(bfa)
January 14, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1958383.), filed by SELCUK KARAMANOGLU.(LIBBY, GENE)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by GENE R. LIBBY, TYLER J. SMITH on behalf of SELCUK KARAMANOGLU (bfa)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIAN ANDREASEN, MICHAEL MORRILL, TOWN OF YARMOUTH with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SELCUK KARAMANOGLU. (Service of Process Deadline 4/15/2019) Fee due by 1/16/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KARAMANOGLU v. TOWN OF YARMOUTH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF YARMOUTH
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Represented By: EDWARD R. BENJAMIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MORRILL
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Represented By: EDWARD R. BENJAMIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN ANDREASEN
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Represented By: EDWARD R. BENJAMIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELCUK KARAMANOGLU
Represented By: TYLER J. SMITH
Represented By: GENE R. LIBBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?