MANN v. RALPH'S STORE LLC
Plaintiff: JENNIFER MANN
Defendant: RALPH'S STORE LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00035
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/22/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/29/2019. Motions due by 8/12/2019. Ready for Trial on 10/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jgd)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RALPH'S STORE LLC. (BENNETT, JEFFREY)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by RALPH'S STORE LLC.(BENNETT, JEFFREY)
February 11, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint, for RALPH'S STORE LLC Per Order #6: Answer due by 3/1/2019. (sfw)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (sfw)
February 10, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by RALPH'S STORE LLC Responses due by 3/4/2019. (BENNETT, JEFFREY)
January 29, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for RALPH'S STORE LLC : Answer due by 2/14/2019. (jwr)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER MANN. RALPH'S STORE LLC served on 1/24/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
January 17, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1960902.), filed by JENNIFER MANN.(HANSEN, CHAD)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RALPH'S STORE LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RALPH'S STORE LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JENNIFER MANN. (Service of Process Deadline 4/17/2019) Fee due by 1/22/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANN v. RALPH'S STORE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER MANN
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RALPH'S STORE LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?