SOUTH PORTLAND WINE COMPANY v. WINERY EXCHANGE INC
Plaintiff: SOUTH PORTLAND WINE COMPANY
Defendant: WINERY EXCHANGE INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00037
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for WINERY EXCHANGE INC - Per Waiver of Service Executed #4: Answer due by 3/25/2019. (mnw)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed SOUTH PORTLAND WINE COMPANY waiver sent on 1/23/2019. (KLINE, ROBERT)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SOUTH PORTLAND WINE COMPANY. (KLINE, ROBERT)
January 22, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1962284.), filed by SOUTH PORTLAND WINE COMPANY.(KLINE, ROBERT)
January 22, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/28/2019. (bfa)
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WINERY EXCHANGE INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SOUTH PORTLAND WINE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 4/22/2019) Fee due by 1/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - label registration and corresponding distributor territory appointment, #2 Exhibit B - territory appointments under the Act, #3 Exhibit C - COLA approvals for Bread & Butter Chardonnay, #4 Exhibit D - COLA approvals for Bread & Butter Pinot Noir, #5 Exhibit E - COLA approvals for Bread & Butter Chardonnay (Winemakers Blend), #6 Exhibit F - COLA approvals for Bread & Butter Pinot Noir (Winemakers Blend), #7 Exhibit G - WXs practice of holding up SoPos orders, #8 Exhibit H - September 28, 2018 email from Moreno, #9 Exhibit I - Moreno email, #10 Exhibit J - SoPo September 29, 2019 email, #11 Exhibit K - WX January 7, 2019 email, #12 Exhibit L - side-by-side comparison of the labels)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUTH PORTLAND WINE COMPANY v. WINERY EXCHANGE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINERY EXCHANGE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTH PORTLAND WINE COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT W. KLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?