BENSON v. WAL-MART STORES EAST INC

Plaintiff: MARGARET BENSON
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00041
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/20/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 6/27/2019. Motions due by 7/11/2019. Ready for Trial on 9/9/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by WAL-MART STORES EAST INC.(RAND, KATHARINE) Modified on 1/30/2019 to remove duplicative docket text (jwr).
January 23, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1963802.), filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST INC.(RAND, KATHARINE)
January 23, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for WAL-MART STORES EAST INC : Answer due by 1/30/2019. (mnw)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES EAST INC. (mnw)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mnw)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court case number PORSC-CV-2018-00515 filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST INC. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 4/23/2019) Fee due by 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katharine I. Rand, #2 Exhibit A to Rand Declaration - Index, #3 Cumberland County Superior Court Docket Sheet, #4 Complaint, #5 Summary Sheet, #6 7.Summons dated 12/19/18 and Return of Service dated 01/03/19, #7 8.Summons dated 11/09/18 and Return of Service dated 11/13/18)(mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENSON v. WAL-MART STORES EAST INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET BENSON
Represented By: GUY D. LORANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST INC
Represented By: KATHARINE I. RAND
Represented By: DANIEL R. STRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?