BEERS v. MENTOR ABI LLC

Plaintiff: SHANNON BEERS
Defendant: MENTOR ABI LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00046
Filed: January 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to Defendant's Counterclaim By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to Defendant's Counterclaim by SHANNON BEERS Responses due by 4/12/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/5/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 8/12/2019. Motions due by 8/26/2019. Ready for Trial on 11/4/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against SHANNON BEERS by MENTOR ABI LLC.(HERZOG, PETER)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MENTOR ABI LLC. (HERZOG, PETER)
February 12, 2019 Reset Deadlines at the request of counsel and approval of the Court : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/19/2019. (jwr)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding Set Answer Deadline: This docket entry was modified to indicate the 2/21/2019 Answer deadline was set in error. Per Order #7 Answer due by 3/15/2019. (jgd)
February 6, 2019 ***Set in Error*** Set Answer Deadline Regarding #8 Summons Returned Executed for MENTOR ABI LLC: Answer due by 2/21/2019. (jgd) Modified on 2/6/2019 to indicate set in error (jgd).
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHANNON BEERS. MENTOR ABI LLC served on 1/31/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
February 5, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for MENTOR ABI LLC: Answer due by 3/15/2019. (jgd)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to March 15, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
February 5, 2019 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/12/2019 from MENTOR ABI LLC. (jgd)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by MENTOR ABI LLC Responses due by 2/26/2019. (FREEMAN, ANN)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN M. FREEMAN on behalf of MENTOR ABI LLC (FREEMAN, ANN)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER F. HERZOG on behalf of MENTOR ABI LLC (HERZOG, PETER)
January 28, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1965526.), filed by SHANNON BEERS.(HANSEN, CHAD)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MENTOR ABI LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
January 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MENTOR ABI LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SHANNON BEERS. (Service of Process Deadline 4/29/2019) Fee due by 1/29/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEERS v. MENTOR ABI LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENTOR ABI LLC
Represented By: PETER F. HERZOG
Represented By: ANN M. FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON BEERS
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?